Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc. v. 21st Century Concrete Construction, Inc.
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Christopher A Boyko |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00601 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Mar 11, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 02, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 07, 2016 5:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
21st Century Concrete Construction, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc.
Park Center Plaza 1 6100 Oak Tree Boulevard, Suite 190
Independence, OH 44131 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 12/02 2:53 PM
Order granting Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice and without costs assessed to any party . Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 12/2/2016. (H,CM) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Fri 12/02 9:28 AM
Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc.. (Henzi, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, November 16, 2016 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 11/16 4:22 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. Telephone Status Conference held on 11/16/2016. Parties shall file stipulated dismissal entry by 12/2/2016, or the Court will put on its own Order. (Court Reporter: None.; Time: 10 min.) (H,CM) |
||
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 11/01 11:20 AM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. Telephone Status Conference held on 11/1/2016. Parties advise that matter should be resolved in two weeks. Telephone Status Conference set for 11/16/2016 at 04:00 PM unless parties notify the Court that settlement has been reached. Plaintiff to initiate conference. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 10 min.) (H,CM) |
||
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
oth_evt
Reassignment of Magistrate Judge - MJ McHargh to MJ Ruiz
Thu 10/06 1:38 PM
Reassignment of Magistrate Judge due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Kenneth S. McHargh. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (C,KA) |
||
Wednesday, October 05, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion to continue
Wed 10/05 2:49 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion to continue ; Telephone Status Conference reset for 11/1/2016 at 10:00 AM. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/5/2016.(H,CM) |
||
Tuesday, October 04, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Continue
Tue 10/04 2:41 PM
Motion to continue Telephone Status Conference set for 10/26/2016 at 10:00 AM filed by Defendant 21st Century Concrete Construction, Inc.. (Sylkatis, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 09/28 11:17 AM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. Telephone Status Conference held on 9/28/2016. Parties still working toward resolution. Fact Discovery due by 11/4/2016. Telephone Status Conference set for 10/26/2016 at 10:00 AM* (*note time change). Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 15 min.) (H,CM) |
||
Wednesday, September 07, 2016 | ||
minutes
Case Management Conference
Wed 09/07 3:49 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. Telephone Case Management Conference held on 9/7/2016. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties are cooperating in early efforts toward resolution of litigation. Telephone Status Conference set for 9/28/2016 at 10:30 AM; Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate conference with opposing counsel and contact the Court at 216-357-7151. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 10 min.) (H,CM) |
||
Friday, September 02, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Report of Parties Planning Meeting
Fri 09/02 11:54 AM
Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc.. (Henzi, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
order
Order
Wed 08/31 11:08 AM
Order (non-document). Telephone case management conference reset to be held on 9/7/2016 at 03:00 PM. Counsel is ordered to timely file Rule 26 report. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/31/2016. (H,CM) |
||
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion to attend by telephone
Mon 08/29 11:12 AM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to attend conference by telephone . Case Management Conference will be telephonic; Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate conference with opposing counsel and contact the Court at 216-357-7151. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/29/2016.(H,CM) |
||
Friday, August 26, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Attend by Telephone
Fri 08/26 12:05 PM
Motion to attend by telephone filed by Plaintiff Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc.. Related document(s)7 .(Asher, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/26 9:31 AM
Motion for attorney Matthew I. Henzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-7777561, filed by Plaintiff Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc..(Asher, Michael) Modified on 8/26/2016. s/ by Matthew I. Henzi (G,CA) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
Fri 08/26 2:23 PM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion for attorney Matthew I. Henzi to appear pro hac vice . Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/26/2016.(H,CM) |
||
Monday, August 01, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
Mon 08/01 3:04 PM
Notice of Case Management Conference . Conference to be held on 9/2/2016 at 10:00 AM at Chambers 15B. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/1/2016.(H,CM) |
|
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Package | ||
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 05/06 2:23 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by 21st Century Concrete Construction, Inc.. (Sylkatis, Scott) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/06 2:21 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by 21st Century Concrete Construction, Inc.. (Sylkatis, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, April 05, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/05 12:42 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc.. 21st Century Concrete Construction, Inc. waiver sent on 3/11/2016, answer due 5/10/2016. filed on behalf of Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc. (Asher, Michael) |
|
Friday, March 11, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
oth_evt
Summons Issued
Fri 03/11 12:56 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon 21st Century Concrete Construction, Inc. (O,K) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
2 | 2
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/11 12:41 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc.. (Asher, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/11 12:37 PM
Complaint against 21st Century Concrete Construction, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-7523142. Filed by Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc.. (Asher, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Fri 03/11 12:51 PM
Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (O,K) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/11 12:52 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kenneth S. McHargh. (O,K) |