United States of America v. $8,700.00 in US Currency
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | John Z Boyle |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00681 |
Nature of Suit | 690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other |
Cause | 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs |
Case Filed: | Mar 11, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 07, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 07, 2016 2:33 AM MST |
Defendant
$8,700.00 in US Currency
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Thursday, July 07, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Judgment - Default
Thu 07/07 9:31 AM
ORDER AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT: Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment12 is granted; the interest of Ismail Karatekin and all others in Defendant $8,700.00 in United States currency is forfeited to the United States of America; the Defendant also is subject to forfeiture; Defendant $8,700.00 in United States currency to be disposed of according to law by the United States Marshals Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 7/6/16. (REW) |
|
Friday, May 27, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 05/27 3:57 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ismail Karatekin and all others by United States of America.(Wenker, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 18, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Wed 05/18 10:00 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to the interest of Ismail Karatekin and all others in the defendant currency named in the Government's Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem.(REW) |
|
Tuesday, May 17, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Application for Entry of Default
Tue 05/17 2:17 PM
APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff United States of America against the interest of Ismail Karatekin and all others in defendant $8,700.00 in United States currency.(Wenker, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Proposed Clerk's Entry | ||
Monday, May 02, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service Executed
Mon 05/02 11:56 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: Notice of Service re: Verified Complaint for Forfeiture Notice of Forfeiture upon Ismail Karatekin, and attorney John W. Rood III on March 14, 2016.(Wenker, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Notice of Forfeiture | ||
8 | 8
service
Service Executed
Mon 05/02 10:47 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: Service by Publication. Last publication date 04/13/2016 .(Wenker, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Declaration, Notice, Advertisement Certification Report | ||
Tuesday, March 22, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/22 2:09 PM
NOTICE re: Arrest of In Rem Defendant by USMS on March 16, 2016 by United States of America . (Wenker, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 03/15 11:49 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: this case has been assigned to the expedited track (see order for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 3/15/16. (REW) |
|
Monday, March 14, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Warrant Issued
Mon 03/14 4:14 PM
WARRANT for Arrest In Rem issued (REW) |
|
4 | 4
misc
25 Pct Mag - Text Order: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge
Mon 03/14 3:55 PM
Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge John Z. Boyle conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
3 | 3
misc
25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Mon 03/14 3:55 PM
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Friday, March 11, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Fri 03/11 1:23 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 16-681-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached.(REW) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/11 1:22 PM
COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem filed by United States of America. (submitted by Mark Wenker)(REW) |
|
Att: 1 Verification, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |