8
|
|
8
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/17 9:42 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ami Dodson.. (Dubrovsky, Anna) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/16 7:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Sanofi S.A.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/16 7:00 PM
Summons Issued as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/16 6:58 PM
Summons Issued as to Aventis Pharma S.A.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 03/16 6:30 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2016. Case Management Conference set for 6/17/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Standing Order
|
3
|
|
3
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 03/15 10:20 AM
Proposed Summons. (Dubrovsky, Anna) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 03/15 8:09 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 3/29/2016. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/14 2:50 PM
COMPLAINT of Ami Dodson against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10287934.). Filed byami dodson.(Dubrovsky, Anna) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet,
|
| |
Att: 2
Summons as to Aventis Pharma SA,
|
| |
Att: 3
Summons as to Safoni SA,
|
| |
Att: 4
Summons as to Safoni-Aventis US, LLC
|