Jeffrey S.L. Cheah v. Affymetrix, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William H Orrick |
Case #: | 5:16-cv-01253 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 12:22 Securities Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 10, 2016 2:59 AM PDT |
Defendant
Affymetrix, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nelson Chan
|
|
Defendant
Gary S. Guthart
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jami Nachtsheim
|
|
Defendant
Riccardo Pigliucci
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merilee Raines
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert H Trice
|
|
Defendant
White Birch Merger Co
|
|
Defendant
Frank Witney
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nelson C. Chan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jami Dover Nachtsheim
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert H. Trice
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey SL Cheah
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey S. L. Cheah
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, March 14, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Mon 03/14 3:57 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Jeffrey SL Cheah re1 Complaint,2 Proposed Summons (Parker, Leigh) (Filed on 3/14/2016) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 03/14 3:48 PM
Proposed Summons. (Parker, Leigh) (Filed on 3/14/2016) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/14 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Affymetrix, Inc., Nelson Chan, Jami Nachtsheim, Riccardo Pigliucci, Merilee Raines, Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., Robert H Trice, White Birch Merger Co, Frank Witney, Gary S. Guthart ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10288194.). Filed byJeffrey SL Cheah.(Parker, Leigh) (Filed on 3/14/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |