USA v. Darby
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Case #: | 2:16-cr-00036 |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 07, 2017 5:25 AM EST |
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Gerald Andrew Darby (1)
Terminated: 03/27/2017
|
Represented By
|
1. | The FBI Is Classifying Its Tor Browser Exploit Because 'National Security' (motherboard.vice.com) |
Submitted Fri 06/24/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 06/24/2016 2:02 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 10, 2016 | ||
1 | 1 SEALED INDICTMENT RETURNED AND FILED IN OPEN COURT as to Gerald Andrew Darby (1) count(s) 1, 2-5, 6-8. On motion of the Government, the Court directed warrant to be issued. Motion to Seal Indictment - Order entered and filed in open Court. (afar) | |
Att: 1 Deft Info Sheet | ||
3 | 3 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Gerald Andrew Darby. (afar) | |
4 | 4 ORDER Granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to Gerald Andrew Darby (1). It is further ORDERED that the indictment and arrest warrant are unsealed at the time of the arrest of the defendant, at which time the indictment may be treated as a public record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 3/10/16. (afar) | |
5 | 5 Arrest Warrant Issued and delivered to USM as to Gerald Andrew Darby. (afar) |