Washington Western District Court
Judge:James L Robart
Case #: 2:16-cv-00397
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2016
Terminated:Apr 20, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 13, 2016 1:58 AM PDT
Defendant
Renee Parker, Esq
Represented By
Ryan M. Carson
Wright Finlay & Zak LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lukaz Wozniak, Esq
Represented By
Ryan M. Carson
Wright Finlay & Zak LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wright Finlay & Zak
Represented By
Ryan M. Carson
Wright Finlay & Zak LLP
contact info
Defendant
Renee Parker
Represented By
Ryan M. Carson
Wright Finlay & Zak LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lukasz Wozniak
Represented By
Ryan M. Carson
Wright Finlay & Zak LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP
Represented By
Ryan M. Carson
Wright Finlay & Zak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher King J.D.
17006 11th Ave
Shoreline, WA 98155
Plaintiff
Christopher King
CHRISTOPHER KING J.D. A/K/A KINGCAST AND MORTGAGE MOVIES JOURNAL 17006 11th Avenue Shoreline, WA 98155 17006 11th Ave
Shoreline, WA 98155


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 16, 2016
26 26 misc Receipt Tue 11:38 AM
RECEIPT from King County Superior Court re24 Order to Remand Case.(CDA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 05, 2016
25 25 notice Notice-Other Thu 11:23 AM
NOTICE of remand to King County Superior Court. (CDA) (cc: plaintiff)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2016
24 24 order Order to Remand Case Wed 10:04 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND AND REMANDING THE CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge James L. Robart. (AD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2016
23 23 respm Memorandum Wed 9:40 AM
Supplemental MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff Christopher King J.D. re9 Show Cause MOTION for Fraud Upon the Court. (AD)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2016
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 4:38 PM
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Christopher King J.D., TO RESPONSE to16 MOTION for Reconsideration re14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. (AD)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 4:28 PM
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Christopher King J.D., TO RESPONSE to9 NOTICE of Fraud and MOTION to Show Cause. (AD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2016
20 20 respm Response to Motion Thu 3:48 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendants Renee Parker, Esq, Lukaz Wozniak, Esq, Wright Finlay & Zak, to16 MOTION for Reconsideration re14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time.(Carson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, April 12, 2016
19 19 respm Response to Motion Tue 5:55 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendants Renee Parker, Esq, Lukaz Wozniak, Esq, Wright Finlay & Zak, to9 MOTION.(Carson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 4:39 PM
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Christopher King J.D., TO RESPONSE to8 MOTION to Remand. (AD)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2016
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case) Tue 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Christopher King J.D. (AD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
16 16 motion Reconsideration Tue 3:56 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Christopher King J.D. (AD)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Response to Motion Mon 4:45 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendants Renee Parker, Esq, Lukaz Wozniak, Esq, Wright Finlay & Zak, to8 MOTION to Remand.(Carson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, April 08, 2016
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other Mon 9:27 AM
ORDER denying plaintiff's12 Motion for an Extension by Judge James L. Robart. (AD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2016
utility Notice of Docket Text Modification Thu 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re13 Reply to Motion: per call from plaintiff, the13 Reply is an Exhibit to plaintiff's12 Emergency Motion for Enlargement of Time. (AD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2016
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 9:01 AM
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Christopher King J.D. in support of8 MOTION to Remand (AD)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time-Other Wed 8:59 AM
Emergency MOTION for Enlargement of Time in Which to Submit Rule 26(A)(1) Disclosures by Plaintiff Christopher King J.D. (AD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 31, 2016
utility Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Public, notice to parties) Thu 8:57 AM
Noting Date Set/Reset re9 MOTION : Noting Date 4/15/2016. (CC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2016
11 11 misc Supplement Thu 2:44 PM
SUPPLEMENT to9 NOTICE of Fraud Upon the Court and MOTION to Show Cause by Plaintiff Christopher King J.D. (AD)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Wed 3:12 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 5/4/2016, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/13/2016, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/27/2016, by Judge James L. Robart. (Mailed to Plaintiff). (CC)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Public, notice to parties) Wed 8:57 AM
Noting Date Set/Reset re8 MOTION to Remand : Noting Date 4/15/2016. (CC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2016
9 9 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Fraud Upon the Court and MOTION to Show Cause as to Why Defendants Should Not be Held in Contempt for Fraud Upon the Court by Plaintiff Christopher King J.D. Oral Argument Requested. (AD)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2016
8 8 motion Remand Mon 2:27 PM
MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Christopher King J.D. Oral Argument Requested. (AD)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Request Fri 4:54 PM
REQUEST by Defendants Renee Parker, Esq, Lukaz Wozniak, Esq, Wright Finlay & Zak for Judicial Notice(Carson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit
6 6 motion Dismiss Fri 4:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Renee Parker, Esq, Lukaz Wozniak, Esq, Wright Finlay & Zak. Noting Date 4/22/2016, (Carson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
5 5 order Order of Recusal Wed 2:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER - Judge Robert S. Lasnik recuses himself and this case is reassigned in rotation to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. (KERR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2016
4 4 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 5:02 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Renee Parker, Esq, Lukaz Wozniak, Esq, Wright Finlay & Zak (Carson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2016
3 3 misc Letter Fri 4:55 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL Letter sent via U.S. Postal Service to Pro Se Plaintiff Christopher King J.D. (DJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Judge Assignment Letter Fri 4:52 PM
LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (DJ)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 4:48 PM
Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (DJ)
Related: [-]
utility Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Fri 4:50 PM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) Wright Finlay & Zak must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/25/2016. (DJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 17, 2016
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 16 2-04750 5 SEA; Related [+], filed by Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP, Lukasz Wozniak, Renee Parker.(Carson, Ryan)
Related: [-] ceipt # 0981-4380752
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Complaint