23
|
|
23
order
Order
Tue 03/28 3:50 PM
ORDER THAT THIS COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE COMPLIANCE WITH THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ENTERED INTO BETWEEN THE PARTIES FOR THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTION UNTIL DECEMBER 1, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT SUBJECT TO FURTHER APPLICATION, THIS MATTER REMAINS DISMISSED AS PER THE ORDER DATED DECEMBER 29, 2016. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 3/28/17. 3/28/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
Related: [-]
|
22
|
|
22
minutes
Settlement Conference
Tue 03/28 8:54 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: A Telephonic Settlement Conference was held on 3/27/17. (ky, )
Related: [-]
|
21
|
|
21
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 03/15 1:08 PM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 3/27/2017 AT 3:30 P.M. BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 3/15/17. 3/15/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, )
Related: [-]
|
20
|
|
20
order
Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)
Thu 12/29 11:11 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b) SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. ON DECEMBER 29, 2016. 12/29/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(dja, )
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 12/19 12:43 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: A Telephonic Settlement Conference was held on 12/19/16. (ky, )
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
minutes
Settlement Conference
Tue 11/22 12:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: A Telephonic Settlement Conference was held on 11/21/16. (ky, )
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
minutes
Settlement Conference
Tue 11/08 4:32 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: An In Person Settlement Conference was held on 11/8/16. (ky, )
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 09/12 4:37 PM
ORDER THAT AN IN PERSON SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/8/2016 AT 9:30 A.M. BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 9/12/16. 9/12/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, )
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 09/12 4:18 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: A Telephonic Settlement Conference was held on 9/12/16. (ky, )
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/17 9:06 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Albert Abdouche without prejudice by UMAR ORIENTAL RUGS, INC.. (WARNER, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
discov
Disclosure
Thu 08/11 12:07 PM
Disclosure with Certificate of Service by All Defendants.(WIENER, JOEL)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 08/11 9:10 AM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 9/12/2016 AT 2:30 P.M. BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 8/10/16. 8/11/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, )
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement
Mon 08/08 2:33 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN TO SCHEDULE AND CONDUCT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/5/16. 8/8/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 08/08 10:13 AM
RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 12/2/2016; A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 1/19/2017 AT 4:00 P.M.; AND JURY SELECTION IS SCHEDULED FOR 1/23/2017 AT 9:00 A.M.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/5/16. 8/8/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 08/09 4:17 PM
DISCOVERY DUE BY 12/2/2016. (ky, )
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Fri 08/05 9:11 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR re: A Pretrial Conference was held on 8/4/16. (ky, )
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
motion
Continue
Thu 07/14 11:27 AM
MOTION to Continue Conference set for August 4, 2016 filed by UMAR ORIENTAL RUGS, INC..Letter Motion.(WARNER, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 06/27 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR THURSDAY, AUGUST 4, 2016, AT 3:00 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. AT THE EDWARD N. CAHN U.S. COURTHOUSE AND FEDERAL BUILDING, COURTROOM C, THIRD FLOOR, 504 WEST HAMILTON STREET, ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA.(dja, )
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/24 3:11 PM
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFENDANTS ALBERT ABDOUCHE, PASHA LTD.(ky, )
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 05/24 11:16 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Louis Panulla re: served Summons in a Civil Action and Complaint upon Pasha Ltd. and Mr. Albert Abdouche by Personal on May 9, 2016 (WARNER, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
order
Order
Tue 04/19 11:23 AM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ANDREW J. WARNER, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 4/18/16. 4/19/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF APPLICATION, MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED. (ky, )
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
misc
Application/Petition
Wed 04/13 12:05 PM
APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ANDREW J. WARNER, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF UMAR ORIENTAL RUGS, INC. SPONSER STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. ($40.00 FILING FEE RECEIVED, RECEIPT #138665)(amas)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY)
Wed 03/23 10:05 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by UMAR ORIENTAL RUGS, INC..(lbs, )
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/23 10:02 AM
COMPLAINT against ALBERT ABDOUCHE, PASHA LTD. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number APE003559.), filed by UMAR ORIENTAL RUGS, INC..(lbs, )
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|
|
|
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/23 10:02 AM
Summons Issued as to ALBERT ABDOUCHE, PASHA LTD.. 2 ORIGINALS Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 3/21/2016 (lbs, )
Related: [-]
|