Vincent Bocchicchio v. United States of America et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-01996 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 19, 2016 1:16 AM PDT |
Defendant
CA Attorney General
|
|
Defendant
Federal Attorney General
|
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Plaintiff
Vincent Bocchicchio
506 West Jackson St.
Lancaster, CA 93534 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 03, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 08/04 4:10 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Vincent Bocchicchio, 506 West Jackson St, Lancaster, CA 93534 re Order on Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60),5 . Return to Sender. (lwag) |
|
Monday, April 25, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Mon 04/25 4:39 PM
ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS3 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby: DENIED (see comments above). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby: DISMISSED. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (lom) |
|
Friday, April 22, 2016 | ||
reportrecommend
Report and Recommendation (Miscellaneous)
Fri 04/22 10:45 AM
RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. Re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis3 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(ts) |
||
Wednesday, March 23, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Fri 03/25 12:39 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Fri 03/25 12:38 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Vincent Bocchicchio. (esa) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/25 12:36 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Vincent Bocchicchio. (esa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Referred)
Fri 03/25 12:34 PM
COMPLAINT filed against defendants CA Attorney General, Federal Attorney General, United States of America Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, filed by Plaintiff Vincent Bocchicchio. (esa) |
|
Att: 1 CV-71 |