Eric Rosenbaum v. McDonalds Corporation et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Andrew J Wistrich |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-02063 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 05, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 21, 2016 2:10 AM PDT |
Defendant
McDonald's Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
McDonalds Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Eric Rosenbaum aka NORM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Rosenbaum
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago |
Thursday, May 05, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Thu 05/05 1:39 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (jloz) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal | ||
17 | 17
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Thu 05/05 1:38 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (jloz) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal | ||
16 | 16
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 05/05 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Eric Rosenbaum. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Lewis, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 04/20 2:44 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (jloz) |
|
Tuesday, April 19, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 04/19 2:54 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Eric Rosenbaum answer now due 5/27/2016, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Eric Rosenbaum.(Lewis, Michael) |
|
Thursday, April 14, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Response
Thu 04/14 3:40 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Eric Rosenbaumto Order to Show Cause11 (Lewis, Michael) |
|
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 04/14 12:17 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eric Rosenbaum, upon Defendant Eric Rosenbaum served on 4/6/2016, answer due 4/27/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lewis, Michael) |
|
Monday, April 11, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 04/11 9:18 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 4/15/2016. (vdr) |
|
Thursday, March 31, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 03/31 3:18 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. All pleadings filed in this matter should contain the case number and the assigned judges' initials to ensure proper routing of documents. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Tue 03/29 3:04 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Eric Rosenbaum. (Lewis, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Tue 03/29 3:01 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Eric Rosenbaum. (Lewis, Michael) |
|
Monday, March 28, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Copyright/Patent/Trademark (CV-31) (Notice to Counsel) - optional html form
Mon 03/28 3:10 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/28 3:10 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant McDonalds Corporation. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/28 3:00 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (ghap) |
|
Friday, March 25, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/25 4:06 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Eric Rosenbaum aka NORM, (Lewis, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/25 4:00 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Eric Rosenbaum aka NORM. (Lewis, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/25 3:57 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Eric Rosenbaum aka NORM. (Lewis, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/25 3:53 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-17534409 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Eric Rosenbaum aka NORM. (Attorney Michael Pendlebury Lewis added to party Eric Rosenbaum aka NORM(pty:pla))(Lewis, Michael) |