Cory Spencer et al v. Lunada Bay Boys et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-02129 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 23, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 25, 2016 2:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
City of Palos Verdes Estates
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
N. F.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Michael Rae Papayans
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lunada Bay Boys
|
|
Defendant
Sang Lee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeff Kepley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alan Johnston
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nicolas Ferrara
|
|
Defendant
Frank Ferrara
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Charlie Ferrara
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Angelo Ferrara
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES 1-10,
|
|
Defendant
Brant Blakeman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diana Milena Reed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cory Spencer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Coastal Protection Rangers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Judge denies class-action status towards Lunada Bay Boys lawsuit (grindtv.com) |
Submitted Mon 02/27/2017 | |
2. | Federal judge denies request for more people to join Lunada Bay Boys lawsuit (latimes.com) |
Submitted Thu 02/23/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |