Summit Funding Group, Inc. v. Prince et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael R Barrett |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00444 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 31, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 27, 2016 5:22 AM EDT |
Defendant
Steven Cloy Gantt
122 Horseshoe Lane
Athens, LA 71003 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Danny K. Prince
3729 Maplewood Ave.
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Summit Funding Group, Inc.
4680 Parkway Drive Suite 300
Mason, OH 45040 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 05/19 3:12 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 5/19/17. (ba) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 02/09 12:57 PM
NOTICE TERMINATING DEADLINES/HEARINGS - The Parties report on 2/8/17 that this matter is resolved; the 2/14/17 status conference is VACATED. (ba) |
||
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/17 10:19 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Summit Funding Group, Inc. re21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment OF FILING EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT UNDER SEAL (Warncke, Daniel) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Partial Summary Judgment
Tue 01/17 9:57 AM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Summit Funding Group, Inc.. (Warncke, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit B - Discovery Responses | ||
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal
Fri 01/13 4:52 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/13/17. (ba) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
File Document Under Seal
Mon 01/09 3:40 PM
MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiff Summit Funding Group, Inc.. (Warncke, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, November 16, 2016 | ||
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 11/16 3:36 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 11/16/2016; Brian Morris and Daniel Warncke appeared for Plaintiff; James Kelly appeared for Defendant; parties have agreed to a private mediator and will follow up with the Court at a Status Conference set for 2/14/2017 at 10:00 AM to be conducted by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett; parties shall refer to 11 Notice of Telephone Conference for conferencing instructions. ; the 12/16/16 status conference is vacated. (ba) |
||
Wednesday, October 19, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Wed 10/19 8:58 AM
Defendant Danny K. Prince's ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint filed by Danny K. Prince. (Kelly, James) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 10/19 8:50 AM
NOTICE by Defendant Steven Cloy Gantt of Bankruptcy and Suggestion of Stay (Kelly, James) |
|
Wednesday, October 05, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 10/05 11:32 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steven Cloy Gantt, Danny K. Prince, filed by Summit Funding Group, Inc.. (Warncke, Daniel) |
|
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 10/05 10:29 AM
Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 10/5/2016; Brian Morris and Daniel Warncke appeared for Plaintiff; James Kelly appeared for Defendant; oral order granting15 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint - plaintiff shall filed their amended complaint attached to their motion 7 days of this entry; a follow up Status Conference is set for 11/16/2016 at 11:30 AM by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett; parties shall refer to 11 Notice of Telephone Conference for conferencing instructions. (ba) |
||
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 09/30 4:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Summit Funding Group, Inc.. Responses due by 10/24/2016 (Warncke, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint with Exhibits | ||
Monday, August 08, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Protective Order
Mon 08/08 12:47 PM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 8/5/16. (ba) |
|
Monday, July 11, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order
Mon 07/11 11:20 AM
CALENDAR ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2016. Motions directed to pleadings due by 11/1/2016. Lay Witness due by 11/15/2016. Status Conference set for 10/5/2016 at 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 10/1/2016. Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert due by 11/1/2016. Defendant Primary Expert due by 10/1/2016. Discovery due by 12/15/2016. Motions due by 2/11/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2017 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Status Conference set for 12/16/2016 at 11:00 AM by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Bench trial 8/2017. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 7/11/16. (ba) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 07/11 11:16 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 7/11/2016; Brian Morris and Daniel Warncke appeared for Plaintiff; James Kelly appeared for Defendant; calendar order to follow. (ba) |
||
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Fri 06/24 9:29 AM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Summit Funding Group, Inc.. (Warncke, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, June 14, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Telephone Conference
Tue 06/14 2:40 PM
NOTICE: Please be aware that a Scheduling Conference is set for 7/11/2016 at 11:00 AM by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/5/2016; YOU MUST ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT TO OBTAIN CONFERENCING INFORMATION. PLEASE BE AWARE THAT YOU MUST BE LOGGED INTO CM/ECF THROUGH THE COURTS WEBSITE (NOT PACER) AT WWW.OHSD.USCOURTS.GOV USING YOUR OWN PASSWORD BEFORE RETRIEVING THIS DOCUMENT THROUGH THE NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING. NOTE: You will be required to use this information each time the Court conducts a telephone conference. (ba) |
|
Wednesday, May 18, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Wed 05/18 2:48 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Danny K. Prince. (eh) |
|
Monday, May 16, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/16 10:41 AM
Danny K. Prince and Steven Cloy Gantt ANSWER to1 Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Kelly, James) |
|
Wednesday, May 04, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/04 9:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Danny K. Prince. Danny K. Prince served on 4/26/2016, answer due 5/17/2016. (Warncke, Daniel) |
|
Monday, April 25, 2016 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 04/25 9:17 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Steven Cloy Gantt answer due 5/16/2016; Danny K. Prince answer due 5/16/2016. (jlw) |
||
Friday, April 22, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Fri 04/22 10:03 AM
STIPULATION Agreement for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendants Steven Cloy Gantt, Danny K. Prince. (Kelly, James) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Reissued
Wed 04/20 1:08 PM
Summons Reissued as to Defendant Danny K. Prince. (eh) |
|
Friday, April 08, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 04/08 10:15 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Steven Cloy Gantt served on 4/4/2016, answer due 4/25/2016. (eh) |
|
Friday, April 01, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/01 2:08 PM
Summons Issued as to Steven Cloy Gantt, Danny K. Prince. (jee) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Clerk
Fri 04/01 2:05 PM
Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (jee) (jee) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 04/01 9:54 AM
***If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jee) |
||
Thursday, March 31, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/31 2:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Summit Funding Group, Inc.. (Warncke, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/31 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Steven Cloy Gantt, Danny K. Prince ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5443598), filed by Summit Funding Group, Inc.. (Warncke, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |