MorphoSys AG v. Janssen Biotech Inc. et al
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Leonard P Stark |
Referred: | Christopher J Burke |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00221 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 01, 2016 5:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
Genmab A/S
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Genmab US, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Biotech Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MorphoSys AG
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
479 | 479
misc
Redacted Document
Fri 02/01 5:53 PM
REDACTED VERSION of470 Proposed Pretrial Order by MorphoSys AG. (Farnan, Kelly) |
|
478 | 478
misc
Redacted Document
Fri 02/01 5:52 PM
REDACTED VERSION of469 Proposed Pretrial Order, by MorphoSys AG. (Farnan, Kelly) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
477 | 477
order
SO ORDERED ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 01/31 1:28 PM
SO ORDERED, re476 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by MorphoSys AG, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/31/19. (ntl) |
|
476 | 476
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 01/31 11:00 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 by MorphoSys AG. (Farnan, Kelly) |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
475 | 475
order
Order Cancelling Deadline
Wed 01/30 8:40 AM
ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the jury trial scheduled to begin February 11, 2019 is CANCELLED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/30/19. (ntl) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
474 | 474
order
Order Cancelling Deadline ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 01/29 12:23 PM
ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties joint status report, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) the parties obligations to file jury-related materials today is VACATED; (2) the pretrial conference scheduled for Thursday is CANCELLED; (3) the Court will hold a bench trial on February 19 and 20 on inequitable conduct and, to the extent relevant and in the case, unclean hands; and (4) no later than January 31, the parties shall refile a joint proposed pretrial order limited to the issues to be tried in February and indicate whether they request an in-person or teleconference pretrial conference (or no pretrial conference). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/29/19. (ntl) |
|
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
473 | 473
misc
Status Report
Mon 01/28 7:18 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by MorphoSys AG. (Farnan, Kelly) |
|
472 | 472
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 01/28 8:40 AM
ORDER re471 Memorandum Opinion regarding pending motions. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/25/19. (ntl) |
|
471 | 471
35
pgs
order
Opinion - Memorandum Opinion
Mon 01/28 8:32 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re pending motions. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/25/19. This order has been emailed to local counsel. (ntl) (Main Document 471 replaced and UNSEALED on 1/28/2019) (ntl). Modified on 1/28/2019 (ntl). |
|
utility
Document Unsealed
Mon 01/28 9:05 AM
Document Unsealed --471 Memorandum Opinion unsealed. (ntl) |
||
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
470 | 470
misc
Proposed Pretrial Order
Fri 01/25 8:38 PM
[SEALED] Proposed Pretrial Order Volume 2 of 2 by MorphoSys AG.(Farnan, Kelly) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 6P, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 6D, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 7P, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 7D | ||
469 | 469
misc
Proposed Pretrial Order
Fri 01/25 8:33 PM
[SEALED] Proposed Pretrial Order Volume 1 of 2 by MorphoSys AG.(Farnan, Kelly) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2P, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2D, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3P, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 4P, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 4D, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 5P, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 5D |