Thomas v. Tyco International PLC et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kenneth A Marra |
Referred: | William Matthewman |
Case #: | 9:16-cv-80501 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 19, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 28, 2016 5:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
Tyco International Management Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Karen Evans
|
|
Plaintiff
Carolina Thomas
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Tyco International PLC
Terminated: 05/04/2016
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 25, 2019 | ||
96 | 96
order
Amended Order
Wed 09/25 1:41 PM
AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT re95 Judgment in favor of Tyco International Management Company, LLC against Carolina Thomas, Scott M. Behren. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 9/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (ir) |
|
Friday, September 20, 2019 | ||
93 | 93
30+
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Fri 09/20 12:58 PM
ORDER AND OPINION GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. ORDER granting64 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 9/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
95 | 95
order
Judgment
Fri 09/20 1:42 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Tyco International Management Company, LLC against Carolina Thomas, Scott M. Behren All pending motions not otherwise ruled upon are denied as moot and this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 9/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb) |
|
94 | 94
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Strike
Fri 09/20 1:37 PM
ORDER denying as moot81 Motion for Charging Lien ; denying as moot84 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 9/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb) |