Atlantic-Pacific Processing Systems, Inc. v. Dermaktive, LLC et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer A Dorsey |
Referred: | Peggy A Leen |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00739 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 01, 2016 2:43 AM PDT |
Defendant
Dermaktive, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jordan Dufner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Atlantic-Pacific Processing Systems, Inc.
Hutchison & Steffen, LLC 10080 W. Alta Drive Suite 200
Las Vegas, NV 89145 |
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
7 Processing, LLC
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Atlantic-Pacific Processing Systems, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Amber Fairchild
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Donald Kasdon
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Debra King
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
T1 Payments, LLC
|
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Dermaktive, LLC
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Jordan Dufner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
145 | 145
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 01/23 11:05 AM
ORDER Granting144 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
144 | 144
motion
Stipulation Dismissal
Mon 01/22 4:16 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Atlantic-Pacific Processing Systems, Inc.. (Julander, Dirk) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
142 | 142
5
pgs
notice
Notice Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 01/19 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Atlantic-Pacific Processing Systems, Inc.. (Julander, Dirk) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Parties
Mon 01/22 7:41 AM
ERROR: Parties terminated in error by Clerk's Office. (EDS) Party Dermaktive, LLC, Dermaktive, LLC, Dermaktive, LLC, Jordan Dufner, Jordan Dufner, Jordan Dufner, Joe Helewa, Donald Kasdon, Donald Kasdon, T1 Payments, LLC, T1 Payments, LLC, Upsurge Media Group, LLC, Upsurge, LLC, Adam Wellington, Wido, LLC, Atlantic-Pacific Processing Systems, Inc. and Denis Betsi terminated pursuant to 142 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM) |