D.C. Fabricators, Inc.
Vermont Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Colleen A Brown |
Case #: | 2:16-bk-11149 |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 04, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2018 |
Debtor
D.C. Fabricators, Inc.
143 Grandview Ln
Addison, VT 05491-8407 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Douglas J. Wolinsky
PO Box 1489
Burlington, VT 05402 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U S Trustee
74 Chapel St, Ste 200
Albany, NY 12207 |
Docket last updated: 04/05/2016 5:13 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 05, 2016 | ||
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition 16-11149 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee . Receipt number 1855041, Fee amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
1 | 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $335. Filed by Raymond J Obuchowski on behalf of D.C. Fabricators, Inc.. (Obuchowski, Raymond) | |
2 | 2 Exhibit Corporate Resolution authorizing filing of Chapter 7 Filed by Raymond J Obuchowski on behalf of D.C. Fabricators, Inc. Re:1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. (Obuchowski, Raymond) |