Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Cecilia M Altonaga
Referred: John J O'Sullivan
Case #: 1:16-cv-21199
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2016
Terminated:Jul 06, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Oct 02, 2016 5:00 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC
Represented By
Christopher Martin Lomax
Jones Day
contact info
Christopher Rebel Jude Pace
Jones Day
contact info
Counter Claimant
Thomas Darden
Represented By
Christopher Martin Lomax
Jones Day
contact info
Christopher Rebel Jude Pace
Jones Day
contact info
Counter Claimant
IPH International B.V.
Represented By
Christopher Martin Lomax
Jones Day
contact info
Christopher Rebel Jude Pace
Jones Day
contact info
Counter Claimant
Industrial Heat, LLC
Represented By
Christopher Martin Lomax
Jones Day
contact info
Christopher Rebel Jude Pace
Jones Day
contact info
Counter Claimant
John T. Vaughn
Represented By
Christopher Martin Lomax
Jones Day
contact info
Christopher Rebel Jude Pace
Jones Day
contact info
Counter Defendant
Fulvio Fabiani
Represented By
Rodolfo Nunez
contact info
Counter Defendant
J.M. Products, Inc.
Counter Defendant
Henry Johnson
Counter Defendant
Leonardo Corporation
Represented By
John William Annesser, II
Perlman Bajandas Yevoli & Albright, P.L.
contact info
Patricia Merle Silver
Silver Law Group PA
contact info
Counter Defendant
Fabio Penon
Counter Defendant
Andrea Rossi
Represented By
John William Annesser, II
Perlman Bajandas Yevoli & Albright, P.L.
contact info
Patricia Merle Silver
Silver Law Group PA
contact info
Counter Defendant
United States Quantum Leap, LLC
Represented By
Rodolfo Nunez
contact info
Defendant
Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC
a Delaware limited liabililty company 111 East Hargett St Ste 300
Raleigh, NC 27601
Represented By
Christopher Martin Lomax
Jones Day
contact info
Christopher Rebel Jude Pace
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Darden
individually 111 East Hargett St Ste 300
Raleigh, NC 27601
Represented By
Christopher Martin Lomax
Jones Day
contact info
Christopher Rebel Jude Pace
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
IPH International B.V.
Represented By
Christopher Martin Lomax
Jones Day
contact info
Christopher Rebel Jude Pace
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
Industrial Heat, LLC
a Delaware limited liabililty company 111 East Hargett St Ste 300
Raleigh, NC 27601
Represented By
Christopher Martin Lomax
Jones Day
contact info
Christopher Rebel Jude Pace
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
John T. Vaughn
individually 111 East Hargett St Ste 300
Raleigh, NC 27601
Represented By
Christopher Martin Lomax
Jones Day
contact info
Christopher Rebel Jude Pace
Jones Day
contact info
Mediator
Thomas E. Scott
Plaintiff
Leonardo Corporation
a Florida corporation 1331 Lincoln Rd Apt 106
Miami Beach, FL 33139
Represented By
John William Annesser, II
Perlman Bajandas Yevoli & Albright, P.L.
contact info
Paul Dewey Turner
Perlman, Bajandas, Yevoli & Albright, P.L.
contact info
Patricia Merle Silver
Silver Law Group PA
contact info
D. Porpoise Evans
Perlman, Bajandas, Yevoli & Albright, P.L.
contact info
Brian W. Chaiken
Perlman Bajandas Yevoli & Albright, Pl
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrea Rossi
individually 1331 Lincoln Rd Apt 601
Miami Beach, FL 33139
Represented By
John William Annesser, II
Perlman Bajandas Yevoli & Albright, P.L.
contact info
Paul Dewey Turner
Perlman, Bajandas, Yevoli & Albright, P.L.
contact info
Patricia Merle Silver
Silver Law Group PA
contact info
D. Porpoise Evans
Perlman, Bajandas, Yevoli & Albright, P.L.
contact info
Brian W. Chaiken
Perlman Bajandas Yevoli & Albright, Pl
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
James A. Bass
ThirdParty Defendant
Fulvio Fabiani
Represented By
Rodolfo Nunez
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
J.M. Products, Inc.
Represented By
Fernando S. Aran
Aran Correa Guarch & Shapiro
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Henry Johnson
Represented By
Fernando S. Aran
Aran Correa Guarch & Shapiro
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Fabio Penon
ThirdParty Defendant
United States Quantum Leap, LLC
Represented By
Fernando S. Aran
Aran Correa Guarch & Shapiro
contact info
Rodolfo Nunez
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC
Represented By
Christopher Martin Lomax
Jones Day
contact info
Christopher Rebel Jude Pace
Jones Day
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Thomas Darden
Represented By
Christopher Martin Lomax
Jones Day
contact info
Christopher Rebel Jude Pace
Jones Day
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
IPH International B.V.
Represented By
Christopher Martin Lomax
Jones Day
contact info
Christopher Rebel Jude Pace
Jones Day
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Industrial Heat, LLC
Represented By
Christopher Martin Lomax
Jones Day
contact info
Christopher Rebel Jude Pace
Jones Day
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
John T. Vaughn
Represented By
Christopher Martin Lomax
Jones Day
contact info
Christopher Rebel Jude Pace
Jones Day
contact info

GPO May 17 2017
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 197 Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. K. Wong; granting in part and denying in part 215 Motion to Strike and Exclude Defendants' Experts. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/17/2017. (ps1)

Docket last updated: 06/18/2018 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 19, 2017
334 334 4 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 3:23 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cherokee Investment Partners, LLC, Thomas Darden, IPH International B.V.(a Netherlands company), Industrial Heat, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company), John T. Vaughn (Pace, Christopher)
Related: [-]