Wire Swiss GmbH v. Quiet Riddle Ventures, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Patrick J Walsh |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-02340 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 04, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 03, 2016 2:00 AM PDT |
Defendant
Moxie Marlinspike
|
|
Defendant
Quiet Riddle Ventures, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Wire Swiss GmbH
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, May 26, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 05/27 4:19 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office re Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE)(AO 121)10 . Papers resent on 5/27/2016. (gk) |
|
Thursday, May 05, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Thu 05/05 9:34 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) Mailed copies to the Register of Copyrights. (gk) |
|
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal | ||
Wednesday, May 04, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 05/04 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Wire Swiss GmbH. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Van Dalsem, Bruce) |
|
Wednesday, April 06, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 04/06 1:58 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Moxie Marlinspike, Quiet Riddle Ventures, LLC. (et) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 04/06 1:55 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 04/06 1:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Wed 04/06 11:40 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Wire Swiss GmbH. (Van Dalsem, Bruce) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Wed 04/06 11:15 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Wire Swiss GmbH. (Van Dalsem, Bruce) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 04/06 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wire Swiss GmbH, identifying Zeta Holdings Luxembourg, S.A.. (Van Dalsem, Bruce) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 04/06 11:12 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Wire Swiss GmbH. (Van Dalsem, Bruce) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 04/06 11:07 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-17596879 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Wire Swiss GmbH. (Attorney Bruce E Van Dalsem added to party Wire Swiss GmbH(pty:pla))(Van Dalsem, Bruce) |