TRACY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Randolph D Moss |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00651 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 05:552 Right to Privacy Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 21, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 03, 2016 4:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS
|
|
Defendant
JOHN AND JANE DOES
|
|
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT BRUCE TRACY
7211 Liberty Pride Street
Las Vegas, NV 89148 |
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT B. TRACY
7211 Liberty Pride Street
Las Vegas, NV 89148 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
LAURA ANAPOLSKY
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
DANIEL VALENZUELA
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
DONALD R. TAYLOR
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
RICHARD SMITH
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT E. SIGAL
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
RICHARD G. MCCRACKEN
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
ANDREW LINGENFELTER
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
ROBERTO Q. HERNANDEZ
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
ADAM CURRY
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
COMPREHENSIVE CANCER CENTERS OF NEV ADA
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
CLINICAL NEUROLOGY SPECIALISTS
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
CENTURYLINK INC.
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
ELIZABETH R. BRENNAN
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
ADOLFO ALVARADO
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
A & B PRINTING AND MAILING
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NORDSTROM, INC.
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
LAS VEGAS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
BRENNAN LAW FIRM LLC
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
AMERICAN EXPRESS COMPANY
Terminated: 05/15/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 05/24 5:18 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to24 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by ROBERT B. TRACY ; USCA Case Number 16-5349 (ztd) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs USCA Order | ||
Monday, November 28, 2016 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 11/28 4:14 PM
USCA Case Number 16-5349 for24 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by ROBERT B. TRACY. (zrdj) |
||
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Mon 11/21 3:39 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re24 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw) |
|
Sunday, November 20, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
appeal
Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
Sun 11/20 5:52 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to22 Order,23 Order by ROBERT B. TRACY. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-4750425. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified.(TRACY, ROBERT) |
|
Att: 1 Notice to Counsel/Party Civil Notice of Appeal | ||
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
.Order
Fri 11/18 6:54 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION: Defendant's motion to dismiss15 is GRANTED and Plaintiff's amended complaint8 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/18/2016. (lcrdm1, ) |
|
22 | 22
order
.Order
Fri 11/18 6:52 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss15 is hereby GRANTED and Plaintiff's amended complaint8 is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/18/2016. (lcrdm1, ) |
|
Sunday, September 25, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to (non-motion) Document
Sun 09/25 11:48 PM
REPLY regarding Docket # 20 filed by ROBERT B. TRACY. (TRACY, ROBERT) |
|
Thursday, September 22, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Thu 09/22 3:28 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Taaffe, Damon) |
|
Wednesday, September 07, 2016 | ||
order
.Order
Wed 09/07 2:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to File Their Reply19 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants' reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss15 is due on or before September 26, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/7/2016. (lcrdm1, ) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 09/07 4:59 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss15 due by 9/26/2016. (dot) |
||
Tuesday, September 06, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 09/06 10:27 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to15 MOTION to Dismiss by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Taaffe, Damon) |
|
Thursday, September 01, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Response to motion
Thu 09/01 9:18 PM
RESPONSE re15 MOTION to Dismiss statement of facts regarding Holland Decl. Should be part of Docket #17 attachments, was missing from docket #17 in error filed by ROBERT B. TRACY. (TRACY, ROBERT) |
|
Sunday, August 28, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
12
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Sun 08/28 4:54 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ROBERT B. TRACY.(TRACY, ROBERT) |
|
Att: 1 14 pgs Statement of Facts, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 02, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
.Order
Tue 08/02 10:51 AM
FOX ORDER: Plaintiff Tracy, who is proceeding pro se, shall respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss15 on or before September 2, 2016. Tracy is cautioned that if he does not file a response within the time provided, the Court may treat any arguments in Defendants' motion as conceded or may issue an Order to Show Cause why the complaint should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/2/2016. (lcrdm1, ) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 08/02 10:59 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff response on or before 9/2/2016. (kt) |
||
Monday, August 01, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss
Mon 08/01 6:25 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Taaffe, Damon) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 75 pgs Exhibit FOIA Case Doc. 24, | ||
Att: 3 97 pgs Exhibit FOIA Case Doc. 27 | ||
Sunday, June 05, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Sun 06/05 2:41 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/31/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/30/2016. (TRACY, ROBERT) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Sun 06/05 2:37 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL served on 5/31/2016 (TRACY, ROBERT) |
|
Wednesday, June 01, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Wed 06/01 9:39 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 5/31/2016; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/31/2016 (TRACY, ROBERT) |
|
Monday, May 23, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Reissued as to AUSA,USAG
Mon 05/23 11:02 AM
SUMMONS (4) REISSUED as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) |
|
Friday, May 20, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Request for Summons to Issue
Fri 05/20 9:54 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Request to reissue summons to USA, DOJ, FBI, U.S. Atty General, U.S. Atty DC, regarding docket # 7, and amended complaint docket #9. .(TRACY, ROBERT) |
|
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 05/20 1:08 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Docket # 8 in error. Correction and amended complaint in regard to docket #7 against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with Jury Demand.(TRACY, ROBERT) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet amended civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Notice to Counsel/Party CO-932 related case form, | ||
Att: 3 Summons summons to USA, | ||
Att: 4 Summons summons to US Department of Justice, | ||
Att: 5 Summons summons to FBI, | ||
Att: 6 Summons summons to US Attorney General, | ||
Att: 7 Summons summons to US Attorney for DC | ||
Sunday, May 15, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Sun 05/15 4:10 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Regarding Docket #7 against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with Jury Demand.(TRACY, ROBERT) |
|
Tuesday, May 10, 2016 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/10 8:57 AM
Summons (1) Issued as to ROBERT E. SIGAL. (zrdj) |
||
Thursday, May 05, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Continue Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 05/05 12:25 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff may refile an amended complaint that cures the deficiencies identified on or before May 27, 2016. Plaintiff's Motion for CM/ECF password3 is GRANTED. American Express Company's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer6 is DENIED as moot. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/5/2016. (lcrdm1, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 04, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 05/04 11:26 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AMERICAN EXPRESS COMPANY (Turner, John) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
service
Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Fri 04/29 12:51 PM
SUMMONS (1) Issued as to U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) |
||
Tuesday, April 26, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/26 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) |
|
Monday, April 25, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Fri 04/29 11:58 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 4/20/2016; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 4/19/2016; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/20/2016; UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE served on 4/20/2016, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/20/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/20/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/19/2016.) (zrdj) |
|
Wednesday, April 13, 2016 | ||
service
Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Wed 04/13 12:48 PM
SUMMONS (6) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) |
||
Wednesday, April 06, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
motion
CM/ECF Password
Thu 04/07 5:37 PM
MOTION for CM/ECF Password by ROBERT BRUCE TRACY(zrdj) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Related Case
Thu 04/07 5:36 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ROBERT BRUCE TRACY. Case related to Case No. 15CV655. (zrdj) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/07 5:34 PM
COMPLAINT against AMERICAN EXPRESS COMPANY, BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE, BRENNAN LAW FIRM LLC, CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, LAS VEGAS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, NORDSTROM, INC., U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616076943) with Jury Demand filed by ROBERT BRUCE TRACY.(zrdj) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
Summons Not Issued
Thu 04/07 5:35 PM
SUMMONS Not Issued as to AMERICAN EXPRESS COMPANY, BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE, BRENNAN LAW FIRM LLC, CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, LAS VEGAS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, NORDSTROM, INC., U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (zrdj) |