7
|
|
7
order
Order Dismissing Case Terminate Civil Case
Mon 08/15 11:54 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: That said action be dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within thirty days, with proof of service of a copy thereon on opposing counsel, that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing Order shall stand vacated and this action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial., ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 8/15/16. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
2
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 08/08 3:18 PM
NOTICE by Francisca Moralez Of Settlement of Entire Action (Humphrey, Russell) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/28 3:09 PM
Summons Issued as to Defendants R & H Liquors & Zambresky Trust. (tnS) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 04/27 8:48 PM
Proposed Summons. (Humphrey, Russell) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case
Fri 04/08 1:51 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with D isabilities Act. (tnS) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 04/08 6:23 AM
Case assigned to Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/07 8:07 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10355152.). Filed byFrancisca Moralez.(Humphrey, Russell) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|