Remote Facilities Consulting Services, Inc et al v. Klein et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Leo T Sorokin |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-10681 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 05, 2016 5:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
Abaculi Media Inc
|
|
Defendant
CMJ Holding
|
|
Defendant
CMJ Holding Corp
|
|
Defendant
CMJ Music Festival 2015
|
|
Defendant
Columbia School of Journalism
|
|
Defendant
Adam Klein
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
President, Adam Klein
|
|
Defendant
Media Leader, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sizmek Inc
|
|
Defendant
Sony Corporation of America
|
|
Plaintiff
Remote Facilities Consulting Services, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
President Michael Sandorse
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Mediator
Judith G. Dein
Terminated: 07/21/2016
United States District Court United States Courthouse 1 Courthouse Way
Boston, MA 02210 |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
52 | 52
order
Order
Tue 01/17 2:22 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: CLOSING ORDER entered. re51 Judgment (Simeone, Maria) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
51 | 51
order
Judgment
Thu 01/12 3:52 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT (Montes, Mariliz) |