Adam Mesh Trading Group, LLC v. Bubba Trading Group, LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Colleen Mcmahon |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-02645 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 05, 2016 5:06 AM EDT |
All Plaintiffs
Adam Mesh Trading Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bubba Trading Group, LLC
1200 Portwine Road
Riverwoods, IL 60015 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Todd Horwitz
1200 Portwine Road
Riverwoods, IL 60015 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Damon Verial
|
|
Plaintiff
Adam Mesh Trading Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Endorsed Letter
Wed 05/31 11:23 AM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Marc W. Garbar dated 5/30/2017 re: Case settled. ENDORSEMENT: Case closed. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/31/2017) (kgo) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 05/22 1:06 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On May 12, 2017, the Court reached out to counsel in this case to inquire about its status, as there appeared to be no activity in this matter since June 2016, when the Court stayed proceedings until August 1, 2016 as the parties sought to negotiate a potential settlement. (Dkt. No. 19.) The Court informed counsel that failure to respond within seven days would result in dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute. No response was received. Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause why its complaint should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff's papers are due no later than May 29, 2017. Defendants may serve a reply no later than June 2, 2017. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/22/2017) (kgo) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Fri 05/12 12:08 PM
ORDER. The Court is conducting a review of its docket and making inquiry into cases where there has been no recent activity. It appears that there has been no activity in this case since June 2016, when the Court stayed proceedings until August 1, 2016 as the parties sought to negotiate a potential settlement. Accordingly, the parties are directed to file a letter within seven days (either jointly or separately) reporting on the current status of the litigation. Failure to respond to this order will result in dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/12/2017) (rjm) |
|
Friday, June 17, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order
Fri 06/17 11:28 AM
AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR CHANGE VENUE TO ILLINOIS STATE COURT: For the reasons set forth above, the Court denies the motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and improper venue. The Clerk is directed to remove the motion at Docket Number 10 from the Court's list of open motions. I direct Plaintiff's counsel to this Court's specific rules for cases where RICO violations are alleged. The Court does not look kindly on "in terroram" civil RICO claims, and from the face of the complaint, it appears that the RICO claims asserted here are no more than that. A RICO case statement must be filed promptly; there will be no extension of time for doing so. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/17/2016) (kgo) |
|
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Fri 06/17 3:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen McMahon: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/17/2016. Decision: Conference held. All proceedings stayed until August 1, 2016 as parties seek to negotiate a settlement. Submitted By: Sarah M. Evans. (mde) |
||
Thursday, June 16, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 06/16 4:00 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR CHANGE VENUE TO ILLINOIS STATE COURT granting in part and denying in part10 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons set forth above, the Court denies the Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and improper venue. The Clerk is directed to remove the motion at Docket Number 10 from the Court's list of open motions. I direct Plaintiff's counsel to this Court's specific rules for cases where RICO violations are alleged. The Court does not look kindly on "in terroram" civil RICO claims, and from the face of the complaint, it appears that the RICO claims asserted here are no more than that. A RICO case statement must be filed promptly; there will be no extension of time for doing so. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/16/2016) (mro) Modified on 6/16/2016 (mro) |
|
Thursday, May 26, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
service
Certificate of Service Other
Thu 05/26 12:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Memorandum of Law In Reply and in Further Support of Defendants Bubba Trading, Inc. s/h/a Bubba Trading Group, LLC's and Todd Horwitz's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint on Grounds of Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Proceedings served on Adam Mesh Trading Group, LLC on 05/26/2016. Service was made by Overnight Mail, Email and ECF. Document filed by Bubba Trading Group, LLC, Todd Horwitz. (Jureller, John) |
|
15 | 15
respm
Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Thu 05/26 12:37 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:10 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Defendants Bubba Trading, Inc. s/h/a Bubba Trading Group, LLC's and Todd Horwitz's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint on Grounds of a Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Proceeding . Document filed by Bubba Trading Group, LLC, Todd Horwitz. (Jureller, John) |
|
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Thu 05/19 5:10 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:10 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Defendants Bubba Trading, Inc. s/h/a Bubba Trading Group, LLC's and Todd Horwitz's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint on Grounds of a Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to . Document filed by Adam Mesh Trading Group, LLC.(Garbar, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Marc W. Garbar, Esq., | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Adam Mesh, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit of Michael Honig, | ||
Att: 4 Certification of Service | ||
Tuesday, May 10, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
service
Certificate of Service Other
Tue 05/10 9:32 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Dismiss, Memorandum of Law in Support and Declaration of John E. Jureller, Jr. in Support [Docket Nos. 10, 11, 12] served on Adam Mesh Trading Group, LLC on May 5, 2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Bubba Trading Group, LLC, Todd Horwitz. (Kiss, Lauren) |
|
Thursday, May 05, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Thu 05/05 6:43 PM
DECLARATION of John E. Jureller, Jr. in Support re:10 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Defendants Bubba Trading, Inc. s/h/a Bubba Trading Group, LLC's and Todd Horwitz's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint on Grounds of a Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to. Document filed by Bubba Trading Group, LLC, Todd Horwitz.(Jureller, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - New York Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Illinois Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - JV Agreement | ||
11 | 11
25
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Thu 05/05 6:38 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:10 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Defendants Bubba Trading, Inc. s/h/a Bubba Trading Group, LLC's and Todd Horwitz's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint on Grounds of a Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Proceeding . Document filed by Bubba Trading Group, LLC, Todd Horwitz. (Jureller, John) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss
Thu 05/05 6:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Defendants Bubba Trading, Inc. s/h/a Bubba Trading Group, LLC's and Todd Horwitz's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint on Grounds of a Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Proceeding . Document filed by Bubba Trading Group, LLC, Todd Horwitz.(Jureller, John) |
|
Friday, April 22, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Fri 04/22 1:36 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/17/2016 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/22/2016) (lmb) |
|
Monday, April 11, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/11 11:59 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Todd Horwitz. (moh) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/11 11:59 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Damon Verial. (moh) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/11 11:58 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bubba Trading Group, LLC. (moh) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Mon 04/11 11:47 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marc Wayne Garbar. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 820 (Copyright); Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 470 (Racketeer/Corrupt Organization); the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (moh) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Mon 04/11 11:48 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Marc Wayne Garbar. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Adam Mesh Trading Group, LLC, Damon Verial. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (moh) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Mon 04/11 11:50 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Marc Wayne Garbar re: Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the defendant needs to be added in "their individual capacities". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (moh) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/11 11:52 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (moh) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/11 11:54 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. (moh) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/11 11:54 AM
Case Designated ECF. (moh) |
||
misc
Case Opening Fee Paid via Pay.gov
Mon 04/11 12:01 PM
Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400. Pay.gov receipt number 0208-12164556, paid on 4/8/2016. (moh) |
||
Friday, April 08, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/08 2:09 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Damon Verial, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Adam Mesh Trading Group, LLC. (Garbar, Marc) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/08 2:08 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Todd Horwitz, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Adam Mesh Trading Group, LLC. (Garbar, Marc) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/08 2:06 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bubba Trading Group, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Adam Mesh Trading Group, LLC. (Garbar, Marc) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/08 1:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Garbar, Marc) |
|
1 | 1
26
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/08 1:36 PM
COMPLAINT against Bubba Trading Group, LLC, Todd Horwitz, Damon Verial. Document filed by Adam Mesh Trading Group, LLC.(Garbar, Marc) |