Original Case: 1:15-cv-01975

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cv-35262
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2016
Terminated:Sep 12, 2018
Last checked: Friday Sep 14, 2018 1:37 AM PDT
Amicus Curiae
PACIFIC LEGAL FOUNDATION
Represented By
Jonathan Wood
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Amicus Curiae
WESTERN MINING ALLIANCE
Represented By
Jonathan Wood
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Amicus Curiae
AMERICAN EXPLORATION & MINING ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Sean P. Smith
Mountain States Legal Foundation
contact info
Amicus Curiae
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Lane N. McFadden
DOJ - U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By
Marc N. Melnick
AGCA - Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Joshua A. Klein
California Department of Justice
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF WASHINGTON
Represented By
Marc N. Melnick
AGCA - Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
ERIC BIBER
Represented By
Nicholas Stevens Bryner
UCLA School of Law
contact info
Amicus Curiae
MICHAEL C. BLUMM
Represented By
Nicholas Stevens Bryner
UCLA School of Law
contact info
Amicus Curiae
NICHOLAS STEVENS BRYNER
Represented By
Nicholas Stevens Bryner
UCLA School of Law
contact info
Amicus Curiae
ALEJANDRO ESTEBAN CAMACHO, Esquire, Attorney
Represented By
Nicholas Stevens Bryner
UCLA School of Law
contact info
Amicus Curiae
FEDERICO CHEEVER, Esquire, Attorney
Represented By
Nicholas Stevens Bryner
UCLA School of Law
contact info
Amicus Curiae
RICHARD M. FRANK
Represented By
Nicholas Stevens Bryner
UCLA School of Law
contact info
Amicus Curiae
SEAN BERNARD HECHT
Represented By
Nicholas Stevens Bryner
UCLA School of Law
contact info
Amicus Curiae
SAM KALEN
Represented By
Nicholas Stevens Bryner
UCLA School of Law
contact info
Amicus Curiae
ROBERT B. KEITER
Represented By
Nicholas Stevens Bryner
UCLA School of Law
contact info
Amicus Curiae
SARAH KRAKOFF
Represented By
Nicholas Stevens Bryner
UCLA School of Law
contact info
Amicus Curiae
JOHN D. LESHY, Esquire
Represented By
Nicholas Stevens Bryner
UCLA School of Law
contact info
Amicus Curiae
MARK SQUILLACE
Represented By
Nicholas Stevens Bryner
UCLA School of Law
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CHARLES WILKINSON
Represented By
Nicholas Stevens Bryner
UCLA School of Law
contact info
Amicus Curiae
MARY CHISTINA WOOD
Represented By
Nicholas Stevens Bryner
UCLA School of Law
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
STATE OF OREGON
Represented By
Christina L. Beatty-Walters
AGOR - OFFICE OF THE OREGON ATTORNEY GENERAL (SALEM)
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ELLEN ROSENBLUM, in her official capacity as the Attorney General of the State of Oregon
Represented By
Christina L. Beatty-Walters
AGOR - OFFICE OF THE OREGON ATTORNEY GENERAL (SALEM)
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MARY ABRAMS, in her official capacity as the Director of the Oregon Department of State Lands
Represented By
Christina L. Beatty-Walters
AGOR - OFFICE OF THE OREGON ATTORNEY GENERAL (SALEM)
contact info
Intervenor-Defendant - Appellee
ROGUE RIVERKEEPER
Represented By
Roger Flynn
Western Mining Action Project
contact info
Peter MK Frost
WESTERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER
contact info
Intervenor-Defendant - Appellee
PACIFIC COAST FEDERATION OF FISHERMAN'S ASSOCIATIONS
Represented By
Roger Flynn
Western Mining Action Project
contact info
Peter MK Frost
WESTERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER
contact info
Intervenor-Defendant - Appellee
INSTITUTE FOR FISHERIES RESOURCES
Represented By
Roger Flynn
Western Mining Action Project
contact info
Peter MK Frost
WESTERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER
contact info
Intervenor-Defendant - Appellee
OREGON COAST ALLIANCE
Represented By
Roger Flynn
Western Mining Action Project
contact info
Peter MK Frost
WESTERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER
contact info
Intervenor-Defendant - Appellee
CASCADIA WILDLANDS
Represented By
Roger Flynn
Western Mining Action Project
contact info
Peter MK Frost
WESTERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER
contact info
Intervenor-Defendant - Appellee
NATIVE FISH SOCIETY
Represented By
Roger Flynn
Western Mining Action Project
contact info
Peter MK Frost
WESTERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER
contact info
Intervenor-Defendant - Appellee
CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By
Roger Flynn
Western Mining Action Project
contact info
Peter MK Frost
WESTERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOSHUA CALEB BOHMKER
Represented By
James L. Buchal
MURPHY & BUCHAL, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
LARRY COON
Represented By
James L. Buchal
MURPHY & BUCHAL, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
WALTER R. EVENS
Represented By
James L. Buchal
MURPHY & BUCHAL, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
GALICE MINING DISTRICT
Represented By
James L. Buchal
MURPHY & BUCHAL, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JASON GILL
Represented By
James L. Buchal
MURPHY & BUCHAL, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL HUNTER
Represented By
James L. Buchal
MURPHY & BUCHAL, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL P. LOVETT
Represented By
James L. Buchal
MURPHY & BUCHAL, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOEL GROTHE
Represented By
James L. Buchal
MURPHY & BUCHAL, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MILLENNIUM DIGGERS
Represented By
James L. Buchal
MURPHY & BUCHAL, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
WILLAMETTE VALLEY MINERS
Represented By
James L. Buchal
MURPHY & BUCHAL, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
DON VAN ORMAN
Represented By
James L. Buchal
MURPHY & BUCHAL, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
J.O.G. MINING LLC
Represented By
James L. Buchal
MURPHY & BUCHAL, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/14/2018 1:32 AM PDT
Thursday, April 07, 2016
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/14/2016. Transcript ordered by 05/05/2016. Transcript due 06/06/2016. Appellants Joshua Caleb Bohmker, Larry Coon, Walter R. Evens, Galice Mining District, Jason Gill, Joel Grothe, Michael Hunter, J.O.G. Mining LLC, Michael P. Lovett, Millennium Diggers, Don Van Orman and Willamette Valley Miners opening brief due 07/14/2016. Appellees Mary Abrams, Cascadia Wildlands, Center for Biological Diversity, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Native Fish Society, Oregon Coast Alliance, Pacific Coast Federation of Fisherman's Associations, Rogue Riverkeeper, Ellen Rosenblum and State Of Oregon answering brief due 08/15/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9931081] (RT) [Entered: 04/07/2016 10:39 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 2 2 pgs Mediation Questionnaire
Att: 3 9 pgs Case Opening Packet
Att: 4 3 pgs Docketing Letter