Peabody Energy Corporation
Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Barry S Schermer |
Case #: | 4:16-bk-42529 |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 20, 2016 |
Claims Deadline: | Aug 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 06, 2018 |
Plan Confirmed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Aug 22, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,000,001 to $50 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,000,001 to $50 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Peabody Energy Corporation
701 Market Street Suite 760
St. Louis, MO 63101 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:06 PM CST |
Citigroup Financial Products Inc
Citibank NA 1615 Brett Rd Ops III
New Castle, DE 19720 |
|
City of Imperial Beach, California
|
Represented By
|
County of Marin, California
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Goldstein and McClintock LLLP
|
|
Attorney
Jones Day
|
|
Attorney
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart and Sullivan LLP
|
|
Attorney
Steven J Reisman
|
|
Auditor
Ernst & Young LLP
|
|
Consultant
Blackacre LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ACIN LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
AMP 368 LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ad Hoc Committee of Convertible Noteholders
Norman W Pressman 10326 Old Olive St
St Louis, MO 63131 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ad Hoc Cross-Holder Committee
180 Maiden Lane
New York, NY 10038 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Catherine Albright
11781 Tunnel Hill Rd.
Crooksville, OH 43731 |
|
Creditor
Dale Albright
11781 Tunnel Hill Rd.
Crooksville, OH 43731 |
|
Creditor
American InfoSource LP
|
|
Creditor
American Land Holding ,LLC
1602 W. Kimmel P.O. Box 939
Marion, IL 62959 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
American Municipal Power Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Arch Western Resources LLC
Gregory C. Dyekman 204 East 22 St
Cheyenne, WY 82001 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Argo Partners
12 W 37th St, 9th Fl
New York, NY 10018 |
|
Creditor
Arizona Public Service Company
400 North 5th Street
Phoenix, AZ 85004 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ascend Capital LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ashland Terminal Inc
One City Place Dr Ste 300
St Louis, MO 63141 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thomas Asprey
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Associated Electric Cooperative Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Aurelius Capital Management LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
BB & T Equipment Finance Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Samuel B Balcom
7172 Cty Rt 13
Bath, NY 14810 |
|
Creditor
Banc of America Leasing and Capital LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bank of America NA
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Chris Berry
1602 W. Kimmel P.O. Box 939
Marion, IL 62959 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
David Berry
1602 W. Kimmel P.O. Box 939
Marion, IL 62959 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Scott Berry
1602 W. Kimmel P.O. Box 939
Marion, IL 62959 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Betty Ann McGee and John Ellis McGee in their capacity as Trustees of the Betty Ann McGee Revocable Trust dated February 24, 2000
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Blue Tee Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bond Safeguard Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Donald R Bouche
2191 Oakwood Drive
Green Bay, WI 54304 |
|
Creditor
Lillian R Bouche
2191 Oakwood Drive
Green Bay, WI 54304 |
|
Creditor
Betty Bowles
7733 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 800
St. Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Donald Bowles
7733 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 800
St. Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tor Braham
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Broun Properties LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CIT Finance LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CNA Surety
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CRG Financial LLC
100 Union Ave
Cresskill, NJ 07626 |
|
Creditor
Cantor Fitzgerald and Co
300 Avenue of the Champions Ste 110
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dominic J Cara, IV
6306 Beverly Dr
Mission, KS 66202 |
|
Creditor
Cecil I Walker Machinery Co
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cedar Glade LP
767 Fifth Ave 19th Floor
New York, NY 10153 |
|
Creditor
Chase Lincoln First Commercial Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Citibank NA
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Citizens Asset Finance Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
City National Bank NA
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Claims Recovery Group LLC
92 Union Avenue
Cresskill, NJ 07626 |
|
Creditor
Daryle L Clark
346 Adon Road
Rozet, WY 82727 |
|
Creditor
Melvin Allen Clark
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Stephany C Clark-Erb
PO Box 1054
Gillette, WY 82717 |
|
Creditor
Columbia REIT Market Square East and West LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Columbus Hill Capital Management LP
Goldstein & Pressman, P.C. 10326 Old Olive St Rd
St Louis, MO 63141 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Computershare Trust Company NA
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Computershare Trust Company of Canada
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Contrarian Capital Management LLC
Stinson Leonard Street LLP 7700 Forsyth Blvd Ste 1100
St Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Contura Terminal LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cowen Special Investments LLC
830 Third Ave 4th Fl
New York, NY 10022 |
|
Creditor
Crown Products and Services Inc
Michael D. Jankowski, Esq. Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren s.c. 1000 N Water St Ste 1700
Milwaukee, WI 53202 |
|
Creditor
DACA VI LLC
1565 Hotel Circle South, Suite 310
San Diego, CA 92108 |
|
Creditor
DMS Contracting Inc
HeplerBroom LLC 130 N Main St
Edwardsville, IL 62025 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Regina Laverne Davison
606 S. Greenwood Ave.
DuQuoin, IL 62832 |
|
Creditor
Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
|
|
Creditor
Jerry J. Dilts
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Donlen Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Donlen Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Duane Park Credit Master Fund LP
800 Third Avenue 26th Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
E & R Lime Co.
PO Box 1300
Cape Girardeau, MO 63703 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Douglas R. Elliott
1410 Chesterfield Estates Drive
Chesterfield, MO 63005 |
|
Creditor
Elliott Management Corp
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Raymond B Ellis
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Elizabeth Elrod
|
|
Creditor
Randall R Elrod
|
|
Creditor
Empire Southwest LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Equipment Depot of Kentucky Inc
Scheef & Stone LLP 500 N. Akard, Ste. 2700
Dallas, TX 75201 |
|
Creditor
Fair Harbor Capital, LLC
Ansonia Finance Station PO Box 237037
New York, NY 10023 |
|
Creditor
Farm Credit Leasing Services Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Farm Credit Mid-America PCA
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Federal Communications Commission
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fidelity and Deposit of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Barbara Fodor
39 Harbour Drive South
Ocean Ridge, FL 33435 |
|
Creditor
Franklin Advisers Floating Rate Debt Group
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Freedom Bank
Ste. 400
Clayton, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Michael Fries
9746 Concordia Church Rd
Millstadt, IL 62260 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Galena Park Independent School District
PO Box 113
Galena Park, TX 77547 |
|
Creditor
Galveston County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gibco Motor Express LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Shanen Givone
2319 Delaware Ave
Joplin, MO 64804 |
|
Creditor
Global Energy Finance LLC
|
|
Creditor
Leslie Glustrom
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mark Gottlieb
464A Liberty St. Apt. 102
Little Ferry, NJ 07643 |
|
Creditor
Greensfelder, Hemker & Gale, P.C.
10 S Broadway, Ste 2000
St. Louis, MO 63102 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
HA Robinson LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hain Capital Group
|
|
Creditor
Harris County
John P. Dillman Linebarger Heard Googgan et al. Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hartline Supply Inc
PO Box 6836
Lakeland, FL 33807 |
|
Creditor
Sammie Ann Hendrix
Rt 5 Box 270-5
Vinita, OK 74301 |
|
Creditor
Annie Herrera
Desai Eggmann Mason LLC 7733 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 800
St. Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Paul E. Hindelang, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Diana K Holway
Husch Blackwell LLP 190 Carondelet Plaza Suite 600
Clayton, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Douglas Houser
80 W Penn St
N Liberty, IA 52317 |
|
Creditor
Husch Blackwell LLP
190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600
St. Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Illinois Department of Revenue
500 S. Second Street
Springfield, IL 62701 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Illinois Environmental Protection Agency
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Illinois Municipal Electric Agency
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Indiana Municipal Power Agency
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Iona Wildt Trustee of Iona Wildt Trust U/A dated 10/27/2000
E Rebecca Case Stone, Leyton & Gershman 7733 Forsyth Blvd Ste 500
St Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
James A LaFollette Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jerry J Dilts Two Rivers Ranch LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Joe Morris Excavating LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
John Ellis McGee and Betty Ann McGee in their capacity as Trustees of the John Ellis McGee Recovable Trust dated February 24, 2000
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Johnson Industries Inc
1001 Pine Fork
Pikeville, KY 41501 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jorge Caldeira Consultoria
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kanawha Boone Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kentucky Municipal Power Agency
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kirby Risk Corporation
1815 Sagamore Parkway North PO Box 5089
Lafayette, IN 47903 |
|
Creditor
Komatsu Financial LP
Desai Eggmann Mason LLC 7733 Forsyth Blvd Ste 800
St Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
LML Properties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Larry E Dimmett Revocable Trust and Ellen M Dimmett individually and as successors-in-interest to Larry E Dimmett
Mathis, Marifian & Richter, Ltd. 23 Public Square, Suite 300
Belleville, IL 62220 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lexon Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Liebherr Mining Equipment Co
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Liquidity Solutions, Inc.
One University Plaza Suite 518
Hackensack, NJ 07601 |
|
Creditor
Priscila W. Longfield
Stone, Leyton & Gershman c/o E. Rebecca Case 7733 Forsyth Blvd. Suite 500
St. Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
MR Coal Marketing & Trading LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
MacAllister Machinery Co Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rose T. Macy
Stone, Leyton & Gershman c/o E. Rebecca Case 7733 Forsyth Blvd. Suite 500
St. Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Daniel W. McGee
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Don McGee
3702 Sun Valley Dr
Houston, TX 77025 |
|
Creditor
Lonny J. McGee
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thomas D. McGee
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Merrill Lynch Commodities Europe Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Miami Tribe of Oklahoma
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ministre de lnergie et des Ressources Naturelles Direction de la restauration des sites miniers
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Missouri Department of Natural Resources
Missouri Attorney General's Office P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475 301 W High St
Jefferson City, MO 65105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Missouri Joint Municipal Electric Utility Commission
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ihab V. Moawad
21 Lawry Ct.
East Brunswick, NJ 08816 |
|
Creditor
Monk Mining Supply Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Monsanto Company
Husch Blackwell LLP 190 Carondelet Plaza Suite 600
Clayton, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dianna L Murphy
310 Richards Ave
Gillette, WY 82716 |
|
Creditor
National Labor Relations Board Region 14
1222 Spruce St Rm 8.302
St Louis, MO 63103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Natural Resource Partners LP
Michael D. Mueller, Esq. Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E Main St Ste 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Navajo Nation Department of Justice
PO Box 2010 Navajo Nation
Window Rock, AZ 86515 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Nelson Brothers LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
New Mexico State Land Office
310 Old Santa Fe Trail P.O. Box 1148
Santa Fe, NM 87504 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Noble Americas Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Northern Illinois Municipal Power Agency
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ohio River Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oppenheimer Global High Yield Fund
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oppenheimer Global Strategic Income Fund
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oppenheimer Global Strategic Income Fund VA
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter Nemer c/o Shawn M. Christianson 55 2nd St., 17th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ottawa Tribe of Oklahoma
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
PEC Equipment 2005 Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
PNC Bank NA
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
PNC Equipment Finance LLC
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC Kelly M Neal Esq One Oxford Centre 20th Fl
Pittsburgh, PA 15219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
PRC Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
PacifiCorp
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pacific Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Joel Packer
Kirby McInerney LLP 825 Third Ave 16th Fl
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Panning Capital Management LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Maria Luciano Pelayo
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Victor Pelayo
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Peoria Tribe of Indians of Oklahoma
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Personnel Safety Enterprises
3716 N Eagle Mountain Drive
Flagstaff, AZ 86004 |
|
Creditor
PointState Capital LP
Stinson Leonard Street LLP 7700 Forsyth Blvd Ste 1100
St Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jerry L Potts
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Prairie Power Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Prichard School LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Recovery Management Systems Corporation
25 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 1120
Miami, FL 33131 |
|
Creditor
Redneck Trailer Supplies
2100 N West Bypass
Springfield, MO 65803 |
|
Creditor
Regions Bank
1401 S. Brentwood Blvd. Suite 875
St. Louis, MO 63144 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Regions Commercial Equipment Finance LLC
James S. Cole 1401 S Brentwood Blvd Ste 875
St Louis, MO 63144 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Regions Equipment Finance Corporation
1401 S. Brentwood Blvd. Suite 875
St. Louis, MO 63144 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Regions Equipment Finance Ltd.
1401 S. Brentwood Blvd. Suite 875
St. Louis, MO 63144 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ricoh USA Inc
3920 Arkwright Road Suite 400
Macon, GA 31210 |
|
Creditor
Francisco Espana Rimoldi
|
|
Creditor
Riverside Park, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Robert B LaFollette Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Routt County Colorado Treasurer
1624 Market Street Ste 202
Denver, CO 80202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
SAP America Inc
Brown & Connery, LLP Attn: Donald K. Ludman, Esq. 6 N Broad St Ste 100
Woodbury, NJ 08096 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District
HeplerBroom, LLC 130 North Main Street
Edwardsville, IL 62025 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Santander Bank NA
75 State St
Boston, MA 02109 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Boris Senderzon
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Seneca Cayuga Nation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Siemens Financial Services, Inc.
Stinson Leonard Street LLP 7700 Forsyth Boulevard Suite 1100
St. Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sierra Liquidity Fund LLC
19772 MacArthur Blvd 200
Irvine, CA 92612 |
|
Creditor
Sonar Credit Partners III LLC
80 Business Park Dr Ste 208
Armonk, NY 10504 |
|
Creditor
SouthEastern Illinois Electric Cooperative
Mathis,Marifian & Richter, Ltd. 23 Public Square, Suite 300
Belleville, IL 62220 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Southern Illinois Power Cooperative
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Southern Indiana Gas and Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
St Louis City Collector of Revenue
Gregory FX Daly 1200 Market St Rm 110
St Louis, MO 63103 |
|
Creditor
Star Mine Services Inc
VonWin Capital Management LP 261 Fifth Ave 22nd fl
New York, NY 10016 |
|
Creditor
State of Michigan Attorney General
Dept of Revenue & Collections P.O. Box 30754
Lansing, MI 48909 |
|
Creditor
State of Wyoming
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Steve Dilts Family LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Strata Safety Products, LLC
Stone, Leyton & Gershman 7733 Forsyth Blvd. #500
St. Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Stryker Sales Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
SunTrust Equipment Finance and Leasing Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TXU Europe Limited
|
|
Creditor
Tata America International Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Templeton Coal Company Inc
David A. Sosne 8909 Ladue Rd
St. Louis, MO 63124 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Cherokee Nation Eastern Shawnee Tribe of Oklahoma
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Federal Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Huntington National Bank
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Ministere de L'Energie
|
|
Creditor
The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
120 S. Central Avenue, Suite 1800
St. Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Wold Foundation
Stone, Leyton & Gershman c/o E. Rebecca Case 7733 Forsyth Blvd. Suite 500
St. Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Minnie Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Patricia L. Thompson
Stone, Leyton & Gershman c/o E. Rebecca Case 7733 Forsyth Blvd. Suite 500
St. Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thompson Coburn LLP
One U.S. Bank Plaza Suite 2600
St. Louis, MO 63101 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TriDelta Iron and Metal Inc
Slade Law Firm PC 5101 College Blvd Ste 5057
Farmington, NM 87402 |
|
Creditor
Two Rivers Ranch LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
US Department of Labor
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
US Department of the Interior
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
US Department of the Interior Bureau of Land Management
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Union Pacific Railroad Company
Jennie L Anderson 1400 Douglas St STOP 1580
Omaha, NE 68179 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Mine Workers of America 1974 Pension Plan
8909 Ladue Road
St. Louis, MO 63124 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Mine Workers of America 1974 Pension Plan and Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Mine Workers of America 1992 Benefit Plan
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Mine Workers of America Combined Benefit Fund
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Minerals Inc
Nick J Cirignano Ziemer Stayman Weitzel & Shoulders LLP 20 NW 1st St 9th Fl PO Box 916
Evansville, IN 47706 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
United States Debt Recovery XV LP
5575 Kietzke Ln Ste A
Reno, NV 89511 |
|
Creditor
United States of America
US Dept of Justice CLB Corp Fin PO Box 875 Ben Franklin Station
Washington, DC 20444 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
United States of America on behalf of US Environmental Protection Agency and Department of Interior
U.S. Department of Justice / ENRD P.O. Box 7611 Ben Franklin Station
Washington, DC 20044 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
United States of America on behalf of the Internal Revenue Service
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Veyance Industrial Supply Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Veyance Technologies Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Village of Marissa Illinois
Carmody MacDonald PC Robert E Eggmann 120 S Central Ave Ste 1800
St Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Elizabeth P. Vosler
Stone, Leyton & Gershman c/o E. Rebecca Case 7733 Forsyth Blvd. Suite 500
St. Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
WLS Drilling Products Inc
PO Box 1069
Montgomery, TX 77356 |
|
Creditor
WPP LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
WYCO Minerals LLC
Stone Leyton & Gershman 7733 Forsyth Blvd Ste 500
St Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wagner Equipment Co.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Warex LLC
420 Main St Ste 1600 PO Box 1065
Evansville, IN 47706 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wells Fargo Vendor Financial Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Westchester Fire Insurance Co
Stites & Harbison PLLC 250 W Main St Ste 2300
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Western Organization of Resource Councils
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Western Refining Wholesale LLC
1250 W Washington St Ste 101
Tempe, AR 85281 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Whayne Supply Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
William E Wecker Associates Inc
PO Box 1010
Jackson, WY 83001 |
|
Creditor
Wilmington Trust Company
Foley & Lardner LLP Attn: Douglas Spelfogel 90 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
John P. Wold
Stone, Leyton & Gershman c/o E. Rebecca Case 7733 Forsyth Blvd. Suite 500
St. Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
John S. Wold
Stone, Leyton & Gershman c/o E. Rebecca Case 7733 Forsyth Blvd. Suite 500
St. Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Peter I. Wold
Stone, Leyton & Gershman c/o E. Rebecca Case 7733 Forsyth Blvd. Suite 500
St. Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Debora L. Wolfe
533 W. State Rd. 58
Carlisle, IN 47838 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Paul D. Wolfe
533 W. State Rd. 58
Carlisle, IN 47838 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wright Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wyandotte Nation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wyoming Machinery Company
Matthew Polito PO Box 2335
Casper, WY 82602 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
X L Co Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
XTRA Intermodal Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Yampa Valley Electric Association
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
York Capital Management LP
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP 250 W 55th St
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
York Multi Strategy Master Fund LP
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP 250 W 55th St
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Zurich North America
Stites & Harbison PLLC 250 W Main St Suite 2300
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB
|
|
Creditor Committee
United Mine Workers of America 1974 Pension Plan and Trust
David W Allen 2121 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20037 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
John J Butler 1200 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20005 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Kinder Morgan, Inc
1001 Louisiana Ste 1000
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Dyno Nobel Inc
Jeffrey Droubay 2795 E Cottonwood Parkway Ste 500
Salt Lake City, UT 84121 |
|
Creditor Committee
The Official Unsecured Creditors Committee
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee Chair
Wilmington Trust Company
Steven M Cimalore Rodney Square North 1100 N Market St
Wilmington, DE 19890 |
|
Creditor Committee Chair
Wagner Equipment Co.
Alex Rosie 18000 Smith Road
Aurora, CO 80011 |
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
FTI Consulting, Inc.
|
|
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Group of Second Lien Noteholders
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
AllianceBernstein
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Roger Attwood
1121 Harrison Ave PMB 325
Centralia, WA 98531 |
|
Interested Party
Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Limited
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
BOKF NA
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Patsy S Barbee
PO Box 281
Eagle Rock, MO 65641 |
|
Interested Party
Steven M Barbee
PO Box 281
Eagle Rock, MO 65641 |
|
Interested Party
David Beemer
398 Washington St
Bath, ME 04530 |
|
Interested Party
Berenergy Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Blue Tee Corp
250 Park Ave South
New York, NY 10003 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Bowery Opportunity Fund LP
1325 Avenue of the Americas 28th Fl
New York, NY 10019 |
|
Interested Party
Gregory H Boyce
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Tor Braham
|
|
Interested Party
Thomas Brown
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
CT Corporation System
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Interested Party
Capital Research and Management Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Marilyn D Castens
2435 S Ziinnia Circle
Mesa, AZ 85209 |
|
Interested Party
Robert I Castens
2435 S Zinnia Circle
Mesa, AZ 85209 |
|
Interested Party
Centerbridge Partners LP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Century Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Cherokee Debt Acquisition LLC
Bowery Investment Management LLC 1325 Avenue of the Americas 28th Fl
New York, NY 10019 |
|
Interested Party
Cintas Corporation
5150 E Margaret Drive
Terre Haute, IN 47803 |
|
Interested Party
Claridge Digging Service
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Connexus Industries Inc
9525 SW Commerce Circle
Wilsonville, OR 97070 |
|
Interested Party
Joseph Cook
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Lee T Cornelison
2164 E Spurwind Ln
Green Valley, AZ 85614 |
|
Interested Party
County of San Mateo, California
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Cummins Crosspoint LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Cummins Rocky Mountain LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
John Robert Danko
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
David Galazen Logging Co
David Galazen 86120 State Hwy 13
Bayfield, WI 54814 |
|
Interested Party
Department of Agriculture
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Matthew Raymond Derrick
|
|
Interested Party
Deutsche Bank Privat und Geschaftskunden AG
|
|
Interested Party
Ellen Dimmett
322 W 20th St
Huntingburg, IN 47542 |
|
Interested Party
Discovery Capital Management
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Donlen Trust
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Debbie Dry
|
|
Interested Party
Elliott Associates LP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Elliott International LP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Environmental Law and Policy Center
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Environmental Protection Agency
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Fernandez Company Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Fifth Third Bank
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
GATX Corporation
222 W Adams St 5th fl
Chicago, IL 60606 |
|
Interested Party
Kimberly Garcia
PO Box 1
Seneca, MO 64865 |
|
Interested Party
GenOn Energy Inc
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
GenOn Energy Management LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Frank Gibbons
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Harlene Gibbons
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Shanen Givone
2319 Delaware Ave
Joplin, MO 64804 |
|
Interested Party
Givone Research Group
2319 Delaware Ave
Joplin, MO 64804 |
|
Interested Party
Goldman Sachs
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Javier Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
David Griffith
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Bertie Grubb
Rt 1 Box 81
Hinton, WV 25951 |
|
Interested Party
Christopher J Hagedorn
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ralph H. Harbold
PO Box 6444
Louisville, KY 40206 |
|
Interested Party
Douglas A Hoffman
5010 N Stone Mill Rd Ste 100
Bloomington, IN 47408 |
|
Interested Party
Loren Hoffman
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Leisha R Holden
2319 Delaware
Joplin, MO 64804 |
|
Interested Party
Huger Foote Administrator of Estate of Margaret Foote
PO Box 62
Earlton, NY 12058 |
|
Interested Party
Max Humphrey
|
|
Interested Party
Illinois Department of Natural Resources
Office of the Attorney General 500 South Second Street
Springfield, IL 62704 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Indiana Department of Natural Resources
402 W Washington St
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
JB Investments Fund II
Bryan T Voss PO Box 310
OFallon, MO 63366 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Jefferies LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Brenda Joiner
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Sibyl Jones
10285 Covington Bypass
Covington, GA 30014 |
|
Interested Party
Kansas Department of Health and Environment
% Thomas M. Franklin 11100 Ash Street, Suite 103
Leawood, KS 66211 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Janine LaDouceur
264 Commerce St
Hawthorne, NY 10532 |
|
Interested Party
Kathleen Lacey
PO Box 296
Garfield, AR 72732 |
|
Interested Party
Lacey-Harmer Inc
9525 SW Commerce Circle
Wilsonville, OR 97070 |
|
Interested Party
Stephen Lawrence
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Lori J. Lynn
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Massey and Gail LLP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Rose Ann McClary
|
|
Interested Party
Bradley McCormack
The Sader Law Firm 2345 Grand Blvd Suite 2150
Kansas City, MO 64108 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Don McGee
3702 Sun Valley Dr
Houston, TX 77025 |
|
Interested Party
R K Mehta
45187 Quaker Hill
Canton, MI 48187 |
|
Interested Party
Michelin North America Inc
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Tyler Mills
125 South Lake St
Mountain Grove, MO 65711 |
|
Interested Party
Monk Mining Supply Inc
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Montana Natural Resource Damage Program Department of Justice
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Moodys Investors Service Inc
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Morgan Stanley Capital Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Morgan Stanley and Co LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
NRG Energy, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
NRG Power Marketing LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Nalco Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
New Mexico Energy Minerals and Natural Resources Department
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Newmont Realty Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Northern Plains Resource Council
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX LP
|
|
Interested Party
Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX Parallel 2 LP
|
|
Interested Party
Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX Parallel LP
|
|
Interested Party
Oaktree Opportunities Fund X Holdings Delaware LP
|
|
Interested Party
Oaktree Opps X Holdco Ltd
|
|
Interested Party
Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund LP
|
|
Interested Party
Office of the Illinois Attorney General
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Pacific Employers Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Fredrick D Palmer
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Office the General Counsel 1200 K St., NW, Ste. 340
Washington, DC 20005 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Powder River Basin Resource Council
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Joseph Reed
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Karen Riley
|
|
Interested Party
Rimex Inc
4415 W Magnolia St
Phoenix, AZ 85043 |
|
Interested Party
Karen Rothgerber
6341 N Folsomille Rd
Bonnville, IN 47601 |
|
Interested Party
SAP America Inc
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Arshad Sayed
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Gerald D Scanlan
193 W Maple St
Venedy, IL 62214 |
|
Interested Party
Janice D Scanlan
209 Fletcher Street
Collinsville, IL 62234 |
|
Interested Party
Kathleen I Scanlan
193 W Maple St
Venedy, IL 62214 |
|
Interested Party
Schauenburg Flexadux Corp
25 Rodeo Drive
Fairmont, WV 26554 |
|
Interested Party
Chirag Shah
10358 Englebrook Dr
Ballwin, MO 63011 |
|
Interested Party
Sierra Club
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
South Carolina Electric and Gas Co.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
South Dakota Investment Council
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
South Dakota Retirement System
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ashley Stanley
|
|
Interested Party
State of Oklahoma
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
David Sullivan
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Patricia Sullivan
|
|
Interested Party
TR Capital Management LLC
PO Box 633
Woodmere, NY 11598 |
|
Interested Party
The Hopi Tribe
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
The Huntington National Bank
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
The Penn Mutual Life Insurance Co.
600 Dresher Rd.
Horsham, PA 19044 |
|
Interested Party
Tirreno Power
|
|
Interested Party
Michael Todd
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ann Toth
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
TriState Generation and Transmission Association Inc
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
US Bank NA
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
US Securities and Exchange Commission
175 W. Jackson Blvd, Ste 900
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Union Electric Co
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United States Army Corps of Engineers
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United States on behalf of Deparment of Interior Environmental Protection Agency Forest Service and Army Corps of Engineers
Department of Justice Ben Franklin Station PO Box 7611
Washington, DC 20044 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United States on behalf of Department of Interior
Department of Justice P.O. Box 7611 Ben Franklin Station
Washington, DC 20044 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United States on behalf of the Environmental Protection Agency Department of Interior and Department of Agriculture
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Robert Veach
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Sudhakar P Verma
15100 Interlachen Drive Ste 918
Silver Spring, MD 20906 |
|
Interested Party
Veyance Industrial Supply Inc
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Veyance Technologies Inc
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Rickey Voyles
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
John Wester, Jr
|
|
Interested Party
Western Organization of Resource Councils
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Kayla White
|
|
Interested Party
WildEarth Guardians
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Floyd Woolever
|
|
Interested Party
David L Young
555 Couch Ave Apt 205
Kirkwood, MO 63122 |
|
Interested Party
Zurich American Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Liquidator
Gold Fields Liquidating Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Other Professional
Gregory H Boyce
|
Represented By
|
Other Professional
Michael C Crews
|
Represented By
|
Other Professional
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC
|
|
Other Professional
Sharon D. Fiehler
|
Represented By
|
Other Professional
Eric Ford
|
Represented By
|
Other Professional
Patrick Forklin
|
Represented By
|
Other Professional
Walter L Hawkins, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Other Professional
Jeane L. Hull
|
Represented By
|
Other Professional
Individual Defendants in District Court Erisa Litigation
|
Represented By
|
Other Professional
KPMG LLP
|
|
Other Professional
Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC
2335 Alaska Ave
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
|
Other Professional
Lazard Freres and Co LLC
|
|
Other Professional
Lazard Pty Ltd
|
|
Other Professional
D. L. Lobb
|
Represented By
|
Other Professional
Moelis & Company LLC
Carmody MacDonald PC Christopher J Lawhorn 120 S Central Ave Ste 1800
St Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Other Professional
Julie A Nadolny
|
Represented By
|
Other Professional
George J Schuller, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Other Professional
Andrew P Slentz
|
Represented By
|
Special Counsel
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
|
|
Stockholder
JAZ Ventures LP
|
Represented By
|
Stockholder
The Mangrove Partners Master Fund Ltd
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of US Trustee
111 S Tenth St, Ste 6.353
St. Louis, MO 63102 |
Represented By
|
1. | Mine cleanup concerns lead objections to Peabody bankruptcy plan (reuters.com) |
Submitted Tue 01/24/2017 | |
2. | U.S. watchdog calls Peabody bankruptcy plan fees 'exorbitant' (reuters.com) |
Submitted Thu 01/19/2017 | |
3. | Peabody Energy Provides Update Regarding Additional Support For Its Plan Of Reorganization (finance.yahoo.com) |
Submitted Tue 01/10/2017 | |
4. | Peabody Energy Gains Approval for $800 Million Financing in Bankruptcy (wsj.com) |
Submitted Wed 05/18/2016 | |
5. | Coal protestors continue demonstrating even after Peabody's filed for bankruptcy (stltoday.com) |
Submitted Wed 04/20/2016 | |
6. | Peabody Energy Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Protection (wsj.com) |
Submitted Thu 04/14/2016 | |
7. | Peabody Energy files for chapter 11 bankruptcy (cnbc.com) |
Submitted Wed 04/13/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago |
Tuesday, February 21, 2023 | ||
3911 | 3911
court
Bounce Back E-mails
Tue 02/21 1:56 PM
Notice: Steven A Klenda, from Klenda Gessler & Blue, LLC, will no longer receive service using the CM/ECF system. If Klenda Gessler & Blue, LLC, is to receive notice, service must be made by other means. (pot, t) |