Tragale v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Carl W Hoffman |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00838 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 03, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 10, 2016 2:54 AM PDT |
Defendant
Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Zimmer Orthopaedic Surgical Products, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Zimmer, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Theresa Tragale
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, May 03, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
transfer
Transmittal Return - Electronic Case Transfer to other District
Tue 05/03 2:17 PM
TRANSMITTAL RETURN. Transferred case opened in Northern District of Illinois as case 1:16-cv-04893 on 5/3/2016. (MMM) |
|
11 | 11
transfer
Transmittal - Electronic Case Transfer Out to other District
Tue 05/03 9:33 AM
TRANSMITTAL of case to the District of Northern District of Illinois. Case and docket sheet transferred electronically. (no image attached) (MMM) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Case
Tue 05/03 9:26 AM
CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO - 354). Signed by MDL Panel on 5/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order
Tue 05/03 9:21 AM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO - 354). Signed by MDL Panel on 5/3/16.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) |
|
Att: 1 Minute Order | ||
Thursday, April 21, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Thu 04/21 9:28 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Theresa Tragale. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Wise, Patti) |
|
Wednesday, April 13, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/13 4:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Orthopaedic Surgical Products, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. re1 Complaint. (TR) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notices re AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge & Gen Ord 2013-1 Short Trial Rules
Wed 04/13 4:18 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (TR) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/13 3:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Complaint,, filed by Theresa Tragale. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by Theresa Tragale. (Wise, Patti) |
|
4 | 4
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Wed 04/13 3:48 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Zimmer Orthopaedic Surgical Products, Inc. , filed by Plaintiff Theresa Tragale. (Wise, Patti) |
|
3 | 3
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Wed 04/13 3:47 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Zimmer Holdings, Inc. , filed by Plaintiff Theresa Tragale. (Wise, Patti) |
|
2 | 2
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Wed 04/13 3:46 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Zimmer, Inc. , filed by Plaintiff Theresa Tragale. (Wise, Patti) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/13 3:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Orthopaedic Surgical Products, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4077365), filed by Theresa Tragale. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/23/2016. Proof of service due by 7/12/2016. (Wise, Patti) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Wed 04/13 4:17 PM
Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (TR) |