Verified Hiring, LLC v. Act 1 Group, Inc. dba A-Check Global
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Referred: | John D Love |
Case #: | 6:16-cv-00328 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 11, 2016 3:57 AM CDT |
Consol Defendant
Advanced Research Systems, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Act 1 Group, Inc. dba A-Check Global
|
|
Plaintiff
Verified Hiring, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 02, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Tue 08/02 2:47 PM
Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding A Patent or Trademark. (Copy forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office.). (gsg) |
|
Monday, August 01, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment
Tue 08/02 11:09 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that the cause of action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/1/2016. (gsg) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order
Tue 08/02 8:46 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ORDERED that all claims asserted in this suit by Plaintiff, Verified Hiring LLC against Defendant of Act 1 Group, Inc. DBA A-Check Global are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/1/2016. (gsg) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 08/02 8:25 AM
ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 8/30/2016 at 01:30 PM in Marshall Courthouse before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/1/2016. (gsg) |
|
Tuesday, July 26, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Tue 07/26 1:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Act 1 Group, Inc. DBA A-Check Global only in Case No. 6:16-cv-328 by Verified Hiring, LLC.(Brandt, Todd) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 21, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Fri 07/22 12:23 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-captioned cases are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues, except venue. All parties are instructed to file any future filings --except relating to venue-- in the LEAD CASE 6:16cv328 Individual cases remain active for venue determinations and trial. The Clerk is instructed to add the consolidated defendants into the Lead Case and their corresponding Lead and Local Counsel only. Additional counsel may file a Notice of Appearance in the Lead Case if they wish to continue as counsel of record in the lead consolidated action. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/21/16. (mll, ) |
|
utility
Remark
Fri 07/22 12:29 PM
Consolidated Defendant added: Advanced Research Systems Inc 6:16cv329 . (mll, ) |
||
Monday, July 18, 2016 | ||
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Mon 07/18 2:06 PM
Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint7 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Act 1 Group, Inc. dba A-Check Global to 7/18/2016. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) |
||
Friday, July 08, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Fri 07/08 5:20 PM
Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verified Hiring, LLC (Brandt, Todd) |
|
Thursday, June 16, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Thu 06/16 3:30 PM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verified Hiring, LLC (Brandt, Todd) |
|
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 06/21 10:40 AM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Act 1 Group, Inc. dba A-Check Global. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( gsg) |
||
Wednesday, May 18, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Wed 05/18 11:35 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verified Hiring, LLC (Brandt, Todd) |
|
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Wed 05/18 4:58 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Act 1 Group, Inc. dba A-Check Global to 6/18/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, ) |
||
Thursday, April 28, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/28 3:21 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Act 1 Group, Inc. dba A-Check Global, and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) |
|
Thursday, April 14, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/14 4:45 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Verified Hiring, LLC (Brandt, Todd) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Thu 04/14 4:02 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Brandt, Todd) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/14 10:49 AM
COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Act 1 Group, Inc. dba A-Check Global ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5702544.), filed by Verified Hiring, LLC.(Brandt, Todd) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Patent, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Remark
Mon 04/18 11:03 AM
Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge John D. Love added. (mll, ) |