Minnesota District Court
Judge:Donovan W Frank
Referred: Franklin L Noel
Case #: 0:16-cv-00998
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2016
Terminated:Jul 27, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 12, 2016 4:48 AM CDT
Defendant
Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff
Donald Seymour
Represented By
Stephen J Fields
Fields Law Office, Ltd
contact info
Kristen S Gyolai
Fields Law Firm
contact info
Brandon Operana
Fields Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, July 27, 2016
6 6 order Order Dismissing Case Wed 4:38 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 7/27/2016. (BJS)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney Wed 9:21 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Margaret A. Falck as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (lmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2016
4 4 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 9:09 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Donald Seymour. Jointly Signed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Operana, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2016
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 12:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (KNK)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Fri 11:59 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil Master list and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 16-cv-998 (DWF/FLN). (KNK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11:35 AM
COMPLAINT against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-4881054.) Filed by Donald Seymour. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet