ProEnergy Services, LLC v. Hess Corporation et al
North Dakota District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel L Hovland |
Referred: | Charles S Miller, Jr |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00078 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 29, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 12, 2016 4:30 AM CDT |
Defendant
Hess Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hess North Dakota Pipelines, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ProEnergy Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Change Venue
Wed 06/29 1:27 PM
ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying3 Motion to Dismiss and granting3 Motion to Change Venue. (RLB) |
|
utility
Case Transferred Out - District
Wed 06/29 1:42 PM
Case transferred to Southern District of Texas. (jt) |
||
Tuesday, June 28, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 06/28 3:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ProEnergy Services, LLC re8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Ludwig, Garrett) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 06/28 3:22 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ProEnergy Services, LLC. (Ludwig, Garrett) |
|
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 05/19 7:57 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re3 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint of ProEnergy Services, LLC for Forum Non Conveniens or in the Alternative MOTION to Change Venue filed by Hess Corporation, Hess North Dakota Pipelines, LLC. (Forster, Paul) |
|
Thursday, May 05, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 05/05 3:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ProEnergy Services, LLC re5 Response to Motion, Served on Atty Paul J Forster (Ludwig, Garrett) |
|
5 | 5
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 05/05 3:00 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re3 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint of ProEnergy Services, LLC for Forum Non Conveniens or in the Alternative MOTION to Change Venue Plaintiff's Responsse in Opposition to Defendants; Mtion to Dismiss or Transfer Pursuant to 28 USCA Sec 1404(a) filed by ProEnergy Services, LLC. (Ludwig, Garrett) |
|
Friday, April 15, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
10
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Fri 04/15 3:42 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re3 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint of ProEnergy Services, LLC for Forum Non Conveniens or in the Alternative MOTION to Change Venue filed by Hess Corporation, Hess North Dakota Pipelines, LLC. (Forster, Paul) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss Change Venue
Fri 04/15 3:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint of ProEnergy Services, LLC for Forum Non Conveniens or in the Alternative , MOTION to Change Venue by Hess Corporation, Hess North Dakota Pipelines, LLC. (Forster, Paul) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/15 1:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hess Corporation, Hess North Dakota Pipelines, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hess North Dakota Pipeline Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Corporation for Hess North Dakota Pipelines, LLC. (rh) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/15 11:58 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hess North Dakota Pipelines, LLC, Hess Corporation from McKenzie County, case number 27-2016-cv-130. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 116000856.(rh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Ex. A - Master Agreement for Good and Services, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Ex. B - Commercial Order for Goods and Services, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiff's Ex. C - Invoices, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiff's Ex. D - Statement of Oil & Gas Well Construction Lien, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Plaintiff's Ex. E - Invoices, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Affidavit of Personal Service on Hess Corporation, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Affidavit of Personal Service on Hess North Dakota Pipelines, LLC, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Notice of Assignment of Case Number, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Notice of Filing of Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - Certificate of Service - Notice of Filing, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - Certificate of Service - Notice of Filing, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - Certificate of Service - Notice of Filine, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 - Notice of Appearance, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 - Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 - Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 19 Civil Cover Sheet |