Lakesouth Holdings LLC v. Kohl's Department Stores Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | David C Godbey |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-01024 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 12, 2016 4:07 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Home Depot USA Inc
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
LakeSouth Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kohl's Department Stores Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kohl's Illinois Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Home Depot USA Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LakeSouth Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
113 | 113
misc
Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office
Fri 05/26 2:15 PM
Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Final Order. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. |
|
112 | 112
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 05/26 2:08 PM
ORDER granting110 Motion to Dismiss. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/26/2017) |
|
111 | 111
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 05/26 2:03 PM
ORDER granting109 Motion to Dismiss. Parties Kohl's Department Stores Inc and Kohl's Illinois Inc terminated. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/26/2017) |