Nakoula Basseley Nakoula v. United States of America et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | James V Selna |
Referred: | Kenly Kiya Kato |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-02576 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 11, 2016 1:43 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Plaintiff
Nakoula Basseley Nakoula
6801 Western Avenue
Buena Park, CA 90621 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 19, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Wed 04/20 11:22 AM
ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Denying3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the request of Plaintiff to file the action without prepayment of the full filing fee be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Reason: Inadequate showing of indigency(see attachment); IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby DISMISSED. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (mba) |
|
Thursday, April 14, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Fri 04/15 12:48 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (esa) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Fri 04/15 12:46 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Nakoula Basseley Nakoula. (esa) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 04/15 12:44 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Nakoula Basseley Nakoula. (esa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Referred)
Fri 04/15 12:39 PM
COMPLAINT filed against defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, United States of America Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, filed by Plaintiff Nakoula Basseley Nakoula. (esa) |