Tierney v. HSBC Consumer Lending Mortgage Services, Inc. et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark A Goldsmith |
Referred: | David R Grand |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-11379 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Oct 13, 2016 5:43 AM EDT |
Defendant
HSBC Consumer Lending Mortgage Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Household Finance Corporation III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Tierney
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Wed 05/17 4:22 PM
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt.39 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Reconsideration
Tue 05/16 11:58 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 ,37 Memorandum Opinion & Order, by John Tierney. (Hopkins, Crystal) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - April 25, 2017 Order | ||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
order
Judgment*
Tue 04/25 11:45 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) |
|
37 | 37
order
Memorandum Opinion & Order
Tue 04/25 11:44 AM
OPINION AND ORDER Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt.19 ), Denying Defendants' Unopposed Motions in Limine (Dkts.23 ,24 ) as Moot, and Dismissing Case with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) |
|
36 | 36
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 04/25 11:42 AM
ORDER Striking Documents (Dkts.32 ,33 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) |
|
35 | 35
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 04/25 12:27 AM
NOTICE [CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES 5.1(a) and 7.1(d)(3)] by John Tierney re32 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Hopkins, Crystal) Modified on 4/25/2017 (LGra) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 04/25 12:25 AM
NOTICE [CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES 5.1(a) and 7.1(d)(3)] by John Tierney re33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to19 MOTION for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 (Hopkins, Crystal) Modified on 4/25/2017 (LGra) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 04/24 11:59 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to19 MOTION for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 by John Tierney. (Hopkins, Crystal) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary | ||
32 | 32
motion
Leave to File
Mon 04/24 11:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by John Tierney. (Hopkins, Crystal) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint | ||
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order
Mon 01/30 9:09 AM
ORDER Striking Documents (Dkts.29 ,30 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 01/26 11:54 PM
RESPONSE to23 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony filed by John Tierney. (Hopkins, Crystal) |
|
29 | 29
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 01/26 11:53 PM
RESPONSE to24 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Comparative Market Analysis As Well As Any And All Reference To The Value Of The Underlying Real Property filed by John Tierney. (Hopkins, Crystal) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Strike
Wed 01/11 10:03 AM
ORDER Striking Document (Dkt. 26 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (MarW) |
|
27 | 27
trial
Exhibit Index
Wed 01/11 12:21 AM
INDEX of Exhibits re 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment by John Tierney (Hopkins, Crystal) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Sheriff's Deed, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - List of Converted Personal Property, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Comparable Market Analysis | ||
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 01/06 10:48 AM
ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Dkt.20 ) and Denying Defendants' Motion to Strike the Amended Complaint (Dkt.22 ) as Moot. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
In Limine
Thu 01/05 8:56 AM
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Comparative Market Analysis As Well As Any And All Reference To The Value Of The Underlying Real Property by All Defendants. (Smialek, Chelsea) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D | ||
23 | 23
motion
In Limine
Thu 01/05 8:19 AM
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony by All Defendants. (Smialek, Chelsea) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E | ||
22 | 22
motion
Strike
Thu 01/05 7:55 AM
MOTION to Strike20 Amended Complaint, by All Defendants. (Smialek, Chelsea) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Saturday, December 24, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
service
Certificate of Service
Sat 12/24 12:05 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re20 Amended Complaint, by John Tierney (Hopkins, Crystal) |
|
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint, Amended
Fri 12/23 11:53 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by John Tierney against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Hopkins, Crystal) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Warranty Deed, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Sheriff's Deed, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Defendants Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures | ||
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 12/08 10:31 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/6/2016 (Sandusky, K) |
||
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 12/05 11:06 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Status Conference RESET for 12/6/2016 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith . The Court will initiate the call. (Sandusky, K) |
||
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 12/02 3:54 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 by All Defendants. (Smialek, Chelsea) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit N | ||
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 11/21 3:20 PM
ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference ( TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 12/5/2016 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith ). Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call, and then include the Court by calling (313) 234-5240 when all parties are on the line. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Stipulation and Order
Mon 10/31 2:26 PM
STIPULATED ORDER to Produce Answers and Documents in Response to Defendant's Discovery Requests. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
trial
Witness List
Tue 10/18 2:09 PM
Defendants' WITNESS LIST by All Defendants (Smialek, Chelsea) |
|
15 | 15
trial
Exhibit List
Tue 10/18 2:09 PM
Exhibit List by All Defendants. (Smialek, Chelsea) |
|
Friday, August 05, 2016 | ||
notice
Error
Fri 08/05 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Error directed to: Chelsea M. Smialek re 14 Request. Document is prohibited discovery, disclosure or a certificate of service thereof. Document was stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DAll) |
||
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 07/05 10:49 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact and Expert Discovery due by 12/1/2016 , Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/10/2017 , Final Settlement Conference set for 5/15/2017 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith , Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2017 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith , and Jury Trial set for 6/26/2017 08:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith . Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) |
|
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Wed 06/29 11:26 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/29/2016 (Sandusky, K) |
||
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Discovery Plan - Rule 26f
Wed 06/22 3:19 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Hopkins, Crystal) |
|
Wednesday, June 08, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 06/08 3:54 PM
STIPULATED ORDER to Adjourn Scheduling Conference ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference RESET for 6/29/2016 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith ). Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Tue 05/24 3:05 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by HSBC Consumer Lending Mortgage Services, Inc., Household Finance Corporation III identifying Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings plc for Household Finance Corporation III. (Ortiz, Francis) |
|
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Thu 05/19 4:30 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by HSBC Consumer Lending Mortgage Services, Inc., Household Finance Corporation III identifying Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings plc for HSBC Consumer Lending Mortgage Services, Inc., Household Finance Corporation III. (Ortiz, Francis) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 05/19 9:46 AM
ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 6/14/2016 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith ). Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order
Thu 05/19 9:42 AM
ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) |
|
Tuesday, May 17, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/17 11:28 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Ortiz, Francis) |
|
Monday, April 25, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Mon 04/25 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea M. Smialek on behalf of All Defendants. (Smialek, Chelsea) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Appearance
Mon 04/25 1:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Francis R. Ortiz on behalf of HSBC Consumer Lending Mortgage Services, Inc., Household Finance Corporation III. (Ortiz, Francis) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued*
Mon 04/18 11:51 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Household Finance Corporation III* (DWor) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued*
Mon 04/18 11:50 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *HSBC Consumer Lending Mortgage Services, Inc.* (DWor) |
|
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Mon 04/18 11:51 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DWor) |
||
Saturday, April 16, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Sat 04/16 11:57 AM
COMPLAINT filed by John Tierney against HSBC Consumer Lending Mortgage Services, Inc., Household Finance Corporation III with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-5649551 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Hopkins, Crystal) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Warranty Deed, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Sheriff's Deed, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Potestivos October 27, 2015 Validation Response, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Potestivos November 20, 2015 Validation Response |