Justin Baker-Rhett v. S. Carter Enterprises, LLC et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffrey S White |
Case #: | 4:16-cv-02013 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 15, 2016 2:08 AM PDT |
Defendant
Kanye West
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aspiro AB
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin Baker-Rhett
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
S. Carter Enterprises, LLC
Terminated: 05/09/2016
|
1. | Kanye West responds to class action lawsuit over 'Life of Pablo" Exclusivity (etcanada.com) |
Submitted Wed 07/19/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, July 21, 2016 | ||
utility
Remark
Thu 07/21 10:17 AM
Receipt Acknowledging Transmission of Electronic Case File Documents, from U.S. District Court, Southern District of New York. Their Case No. 1:16-cv-05801. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016) |
||
Wednesday, July 20, 2016 | ||
utility
Remark
Wed 07/20 8:59 AM
Case electronically transferred to the U.S. District Court, Southern District of New York, Manhattan Division. Counsel notified. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016) |
||
Monday, July 18, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 07/18 2:39 PM
ORDER GRANTING 23 STIPULATION TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK, MANHATTAN DIVISION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 18, 2016. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 07/18 9:10 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK, MANHATTAN DIVISION filed by Aspiro AB. (Shively, Ashley) (Filed on 7/18/2016) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Wed 07/06 6:18 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint byKanye West. (Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/6/2016) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 07/06 1:26 PM
ORDER GRANTING 20 STIPULATION Extending Briefing Schedule as to 18 MOTION to Change Venue or in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/19/2016. Replies due by 7/26/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/6/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016) |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 07/05 11:01 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re18 MOTION to Change Venue or in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss, filed by Justin Baker-Rhett. (Logan, Todd) (Filed on 7/5/2016) |
|
Monday, June 20, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Mon 06/20 4:52 PM
Declaration of Lior Tibon in Support of18 MOTION to Change Venue Or In The Alternative Motion To Dismiss filed byAspiro AB. (Shively, Ashley) (Filed on 6/20/2016) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Change Venue
Mon 06/20 4:50 PM
MOTION to Change Venue Or In The Alternative Motion To Dismiss filed by Aspiro AB. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 7/5/2016. Replies due by 7/12/2016.(Shively, Ashley) (Filed on 6/20/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 17, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Fri 06/17 4:30 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Kanye West to Respond to Plaintiff's Corrected Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Kanye West. (Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/17/2016) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/17 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Avedissian (Avedissian, Christina) (Filed on 6/17/2016) |
|
Wednesday, June 15, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 06/15 9:12 AM
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/15/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016) |
|
Tuesday, June 14, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/14 3:21 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 6/14/2016. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Thu 06/09 9:39 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016) |
|
Wednesday, June 08, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/08 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Kiyul Lee (Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/8/2016) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/08 9:33 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aspiro AB.. (Shively, Ashley) (Filed on 6/8/2016) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Tue 05/24 9:57 AM
STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Aspiro AB. (Shively, Ashley) (Filed on 5/24/2016) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/24 9:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Lynn Shively , Robert D. Phillips, Jr., and Thomas A. Evans as counsel for Defendant Aspiro AB (Shively, Ashley) (Filed on 5/24/2016) |
|
Monday, May 23, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 05/23 2:55 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Justin Baker-Rhett.. (Logan, Todd) (Filed on 5/23/2016) |
|
7 | 7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 05/23 1:12 PM
CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/6/2016. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 05/09 12:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Corrected First Amended Class Action Complaint against Aspiro AB, Kanye West. Filed byJustin Baker-Rhett. (Logan, Todd) (Filed on 5/9/2016) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 05/06 3:30 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kanye West, Aspiro AB. Filed byJustin Baker-Rhett. (Logan, Todd) (Filed on 5/6/2016) |
|
Tuesday, April 19, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/19 10:49 AM
Summons Issued as to S. Carter Enterprises, LLC, Kanye West. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016) |
|
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 04/19 10:48 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/19/2016. Case Management Conference set for 7/26/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 04/18 12:15 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 5/2/2016. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016) |
|
1 | 1
26
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/18 7:50 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10377577.). Filed byJustin Baker-Rhett.(Logan, Todd) (Filed on 4/18/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Summons S. Carter Enterprises LLC Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Kanye West Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |