Stauch v. Horry County School District
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | R Bryan Harwell |
Referred: | Thomas E Rogers, III |
Case #: | 4:16-cv-01228 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex) |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 17, 2016 5:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
Horry County School District
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Latecia Stauch
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago |
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 10/30 3:18 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Horry County School District. (Gilliam, James) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order
Fri 09/08 3:43 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 9/8/2017. (hcic, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 07/12 1:49 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/22/2017, Motions due by 12/8/2017, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 12/22/2017, Jury Selection Deadline 2/2/2018, ADR Statement due by 9/8/2017, Mediation Due by 10/9/2017. Motions in limine must be filed at least three (3) weeks prior to February 2, 2018.Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 07/12/2017. (dsto, ) |
|
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Wed 07/12 1:46 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 28 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 07/12/2017.(dsto, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 07/11 9:27 AM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Horry County School District. Response to Motion due by 7/25/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Gilliam, James) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance
Tue 06/06 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Joshua Timothy Howle for June 22, 2017 through July 14, 2017 (Howle, Joshua) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 05/01 10:52 AM
CONSENT SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/24/2017, Motions due by 10/9/2017, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/23/2017, Jury Selection Deadline 12/4/2017, ADR Statement due by 7/10/2017, Mediation Due by 8/8/2017. Motions in limine must be filed at least three (3) weeks prior to December 4, 2017 (November 13, 2017). Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection (November 27, 2017).Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 05/01/2017. (dsto, ) |
|
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 05/01 10:49 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 24 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 05/01/2017.(dsto, ) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 04/17 12:19 PM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct22 Scheduling Order,, by Horry County School District. Response to Motion due by 5/1/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Gilliam, James) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance
Wed 03/29 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Joshua Timothy Howle for August 3, 2017 through August 7, 2017, September 13, 2017 through September 15, 2017, November 16, 2017 through November 18, 2017, and November 30, 2017 through December 1, 2017 (Howle, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 01/18 8:59 AM
CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/24/2017, Motions due by 7/10/2017, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/24/2017, Jury Selection Deadline 9/4/2017, ADR Statement due by 4/10/2017, Mediation Due by 5/9/2017. Motions in limine must be filed at least three (3) weeks prior to September 4, 2017 (August 14, 2017). Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 01/18/2017. (dsto, ) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Wed 01/18 8:54 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 18 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 01/18/2017.(dsto, ) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 01/18 8:51 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 01/18/2017.(dsto, ) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 01/13 3:10 PM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct8 Scheduling Order,,, by Horry County School District. Response to Motion due by 1/27/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Gilliam, James) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 11/21 10:38 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Horry County School District. Response to Motion due by 12/8/2016. No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Boan, Leigh) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Fri 09/30 11:00 AM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Horry County School District.(Boan, Leigh) (Main Document 13 replaced on 9/30/2016 to correct filing error) (dsto) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Joint Conference and Scheduling Order | ||
Thursday, September 22, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance
Thu 09/22 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Joshua Timothy Howle for December 10-15, 2016 (Howle, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, August 30, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance
Tue 08/30 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by James Keith Gilliam for September 12, 2016 through October 31, 2016 (Gilliam, James) |
|
Thursday, July 28, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 07/28 9:32 AM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/17/2016, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/31/2016, Rule 26 Report due by 8/31/2016, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/26/2016, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/28/2016, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/28/2016, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/28/2016, Discovery due by 2/23/2017, Motions due by 3/10/2017, Jury Selection Deadline 7/3/2017, ADR Statement due by 4/10/2017, Mediation Due by 5/9/2017. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to July 3, 2017. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 07/28/2016. (dsto, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 26, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 07/26 3:24 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Horry County School District.(Boan, Leigh) |
|
5 | 5
10
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/26 3:22 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Horry County School District.(Boan, Leigh) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/21 8:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Horry County School District. Service due by 7/25/2016 (dsto, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Thu 04/21 8:37 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Latecia Stauch.(dsto, ) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/21 8:34 AM
COMPLAINT against Horry County School District ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-6511084.), filed by Latecia Stauch. Service due by 7/22/2016(dsto, ) |