Minnesota District Court
Judge:Donovan W Frank
Referred: Hildy Bowbeer
Case #: 0:16-cv-01061
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2016
Terminated:Dec 30, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 19, 2016 4:37 AM CDT
Defendant
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael T Berger
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Margaret Ann Santos
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Daniel K. Ryan
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Barton Breen
Represented By
Stephen J Fields
Fields Law Office, Ltd
contact info
Kristen S Gyolai
Fields Law Firm
contact info
Brandon Operana
Fields Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, December 30, 2016
21 21 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Fri 8:51 AM
JUDGMENT(kt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
Thursday, December 29, 2016
20 20 order Order Thu 1:34 PM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re19 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 12/29/2016. (RLB)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 10:16 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Barton Breen. (Santos, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2016
18 18 order Order Fri 4:27 PM
ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Settlement Conference set for 1/30/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/23/2016. (las)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2016
17 17 minutes Status Conference Mon 4:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Status Conference held on 9/19/2016. The Court and counsel discussed the parties' progress in settlement discussions. (TSS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2016
16 16 misc Letter to Magistrate Judge Thu 8:08 AM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Barton Breen . (Operana, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2016
15 15 notice Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney Tue 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2016
13 13 order Scheduling Order Tue 3:15 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Status Conference by telephone set for 9/19/2016 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Amended Pleadings due by 10/6/2013. Motions (disp) due by 2/1/2017. Ready for trial due by 7/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/25/16. (LEG)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2016
12 12 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 11:58 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/25/2016. Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued. (LEG)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2016
11 11 misc Rule 26(f) Report Mon 4:27 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Barton Breen. Jointly Signed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Operana, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2016
10 10 order Order Fri 1:13 PM
NOTICE/ORDER OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCES (ERISA CASES) Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2016 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 632 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/24/2016.(MMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Monday, June 20, 2016
9 9 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Mon 10:38 AM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. MetLife, Inc. is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10:31 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2016
7 7 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 11:20 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel K. Ryan for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/14/16. (MAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2016
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Mon 4:24 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-4973160 by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2016
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 5:27 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 4/22/2016, answer due 6/21/2016. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 5:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Berger on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 4:04 PM
Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (kt)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Fri 4:03 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 16-cv-1061 DWF/HB. (kt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 2:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-4893411.) Filed by Barton Breen. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet