St. Luke Technologies, LLC v. MobileIron, Inc.
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00430 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 25, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 11, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 22, 2016 4:42 AM CDT |
Consol Plaintiff
St. Luke Technologies, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
St. Luke Technologies, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
David Folsom
dfolsom@jw.com Jackson Walker, LLP 6002-B Summerfield Drive
Texarkana, TX 75503 |
|
Plaintiff
St. Luke Technologies, LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Consol Defendant
Athenahealth, Inc.
Terminated: 09/26/2016
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
Cerner Corporation
Terminated: 10/11/2016
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
Thales e-Security, Inc.
Terminated: 06/27/2016
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
Trend Micro Incorporated
Terminated: 06/22/2016
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
Vormetric, Inc.
Terminated: 06/27/2016
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Athenahealth, Inc.
Terminated: 09/26/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MobileIron, Inc.
Terminated: 06/27/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
65 | 65
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Tue 10/11 2:34 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, ) |
|
64 | 64
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Tue 10/11 2:30 PM
ORDER granting63 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice Cerner Corporation (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv485 . Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/11/2016. (ch, ) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
63 | 63
motion
Dismiss
Fri 10/07 12:02 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Cerner Corporation, St. Luke Technologies, LLC.(Olavi, Matt) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order |