Donald B. Williams v. The People of the State of California et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew J Guilford |
Referred: | Patrick J Walsh |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-02758 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 30, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 12/08 4:57 PM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,41 CCA # 17-56639 The judgment of the 9th Circuit Court, entered November 16, 2017, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of the 9th CCA issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Order43 DISMISSED.] (mat) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Fri 11/17 1:12 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,41 filed by Donald B Williams. CCA # 17-56639 This appeal isdismissed for lack of jurisdiction. [See document for all details.] (mat) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
appeal
USCA Notification of Case Number
Mon 10/30 9:15 AM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 17-56639 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,41 as to Plaintiff Donald B Williams. (shb) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
appeal
Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
Fri 10/27 10:47 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL OF DISTRICT JUDGE'S ACCEPTANCE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S RECOMMENDATIONS, to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Donald B Williams. Appeal of Judgment,37 Filed On: 7/30/17; Entered On: 8/1/17; In forma Pauperis granted on 4/25/16, see document 4. (mat) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
attorney
Change of Address
Wed 10/11 8:39 AM
NOTICE of Change of address Changing plaintiff's address to Donald B. Williams, 5913 Cottage Hill Rd. Mobile, AL 36609. Filed by Plaintiff Donald B Williams. (sbou) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 09/25 4:19 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Donald B. Williams P.O. Box 41084 Pasadena, CA 91114 re R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations36 . (dv) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
order
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting (CV 104A)
Mon 09/25 4:38 PM
NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, ORDERING Under Seal Letter submitted by Plaintiff Donald B Williams received on 8/28/2017 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: No copy provided for judge; Case closed on 7/30/2017. (mba) |
|
Sunday, July 30, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
judgmentCV
Judgment
Tue 08/01 1:45 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Pursuant to the Order Accepting Report and Adopting Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge, IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that the action is dismissed (as against Defendant public defenders without prejudice and as to the remaining Defendants with prejudice). Related to: R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations36 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (sbou) |
|
36 | 36
order
R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations
Tue 08/01 1:42 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND ADOPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford for Report and Recommendation (Issued)34 . (sbou) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 06/16 1:59 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoenas31 previously scheduled for 6/20/2017 at 1:30 PM has been taken off calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (im) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
reportrecommend
Report and Recommendation (Issued)
Tue 06/13 10:04 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. Re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights),1 . Objections to R&R due by 7/5/2017. (sbou) |
|
33 | 33
reportrecommend
Notice of Report and Recommendation
Tue 06/13 10:02 AM
NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. Objections to R&R due by 7/5/2017. (sbou) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Appendix
Wed 05/24 2:41 PM
Notice of Addendum filed by Plaintiff Donald B Williams. Re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for to allow Plaintiff to travel30 . (sbou) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Order
Mon 05/22 3:23 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for leave to serve subpoenas filed by Plaintiff Donald B Williams. Motion set for hearing on 6/20/2017 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (sbou) |
|
Att: 1 Lodged Proposed Order | ||
30 | 30
motion
Order
Mon 05/22 3:18 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to allow Plaintiff to travel back to California for chronic medical treatments filed by Plaintiff Donald B Williams.. (sbou) |
|
Att: 1 Lodged Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 05/15 9:30 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh27 Motion previously scheduled for 5/17/17 1:30 PM has been taken off calendar and is under submission. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (im) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Order
Mon 05/15 12:13 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order filed by Plaintiff Donald B Williams.. (sbou) |
|
Att: 1 Lodged Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Order
Thu 05/04 3:05 PM
REQUEST for Order for leave to serve subpoenas, filed by Plaintiff Donald B Williams. (sbou) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/03 3:07 PM
NOTICE of filing request for additional exculpatory evidence, filed by Plaintiff Donald B Williams. (sbou) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Order
Wed 05/03 3:06 PM
REQUEST for Defense Counsel's Sworn Affidavit, filed by Plaintiff Donald B Williams. (sbou) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
For Order
Thu 03/16 4:15 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) re Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to File Exculpatory Evidence with the Court Pursuant to the Court's August 9, 2016 Order by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. Before the Court is Plaintiff's ex parte motion to file exculpatory evidence/exhibits with the Court pursuant to the Court's August 9, 2016 order. (Doc. No. 22.) The ex parte motion is granted. re22 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order. (sbou) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Thu 01/05 4:37 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by Chief U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. Effective, January 4, 2017, Judge Walsh will be located at the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, COURTROOM 790 on the 7th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 790 of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 1st floor of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse. Magistrate Judge Walsh's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Isabel Martinez, may be reached at (213) 894-8958. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Tuesday, August 23, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Order
Thu 08/25 4:14 PM
PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION to file Exculpatory evidence filed by Plaintiff Donald B Williams. (sbou) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/25 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Answer and Objection in opposition to the Court's May 2, 2016 Order to Show Cause. filed by Plaintiff Donald B Williams. (sbou) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Letter
Thu 08/18 1:22 PM
Letter from David Hoffman. (sbou) |
|
Tuesday, August 09, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
minutes
Show Cause Hearing For Order
Fri 08/12 10:04 AM
MINUTES OF Order to Show Cause Hearing Re: Objector David Hoffman's Ex Parte Application for a Protective Order and Issuance of an Order to Show Cause as to Why Plaintiff Should Not be Held in Contempt (Doc. No. 15.) held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. Case called and appearances made. The Court reminded Plaintiff that there is a pending order to show cause as to why the case should not be dismissed and he must respond to that order by August 31, 2016. (See document for further details.) Court Recorder: CS 08/09/16. (sbou) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Order
Tue 08/09 4:01 PM
MOTION to produce evidence which is in the care custody of the United States Government, filed by Plaintiff Donald B Williams. (sbou) |
|
Monday, August 08, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
9
pgs
misc
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Mon 08/08 1:38 PM
Notice of Ex Parte Opposition, and Motion and Demand for Production, filed by Plaintiff Donald B Williams. (sbou) |
|
Tuesday, July 26, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
For Order
Wed 07/27 9:21 AM
ORDER re Objector David Hoffman's Ex Parte Application for a Protective Order andIssuance of an Order to Show Cause as to Why Plaintiff Should Not be Held in Contempt (Doc. No. 15.) by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. Before the Court is objector David Hoffman's ex parte application for a protective order and for the issuance of an order to show cause as to why Plaintiff should not be held in contempt of Court for serving a subpoena in direct contradiction to a Court order and, for forging the clerk of the court's signature on the subpoena. Mr. Hoffman's application is granted. Plaintiff is also ordered to appear before the Court in person on Tuesday, August 9, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. at 312 N. Spring Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom 23, Los Angeles, CA 90012. (See document for further details.)15 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order (sbou) |
|
Monday, July 25, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Order
Mon 07/25 4:26 PM
First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for PROTECTIVE ORDER AND FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY WILLIAMS SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT OF COURT, ALTERNATIVELY FOR ISSUANCE OF AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON HOFFMAN'S MOTION FOR RELIEF filed by Objector David Hoffman. (Attorney David Hoffman added to party David Hoffman(pty:obj)) (Hoffman, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Re Objectors' Ex Parte Application | ||
Thursday, May 26, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Continue
Fri 05/27 2:58 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Plaintiff's Motion to Continue the June 15, 2016 Hearing in Re: Plaintiff's Motion to Designate Expert Witnesses by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh13 . Before the Court is Plaintiff's motion asking the Court to continue the hearing regarding his previous motion to have the Court designate an expert witness. Plaintiff's motion is denied as moot. SEE ORDER. (im) |
|
Wednesday, May 25, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Continue
Thu 05/26 3:26 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Plaintiff's Motion to Designate Expert Witnesses from June 15, 2016 to June 22, 2016 at 9:00 AM9 8 7 filed by Plaintiff Donald B Williams. (im) |
|
Monday, May 23, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Enlargement of Time to File
Mon 05/23 3:20 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) re Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File a Response to the Court's Screening Order (Doc. No. 11.) by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. The Court grants Plaintiff's request for an enlargement of time. Plaintiff must reply to the Court's screening order no later than, Wednesday, August 31, 2016. (See document for further details.) granting11 MOTION for Enlargement of Time to File (sbou) |
|
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Enlargement of Time to File Document
Mon 05/23 11:18 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Enlargement of Time to File Answer to the Court's Order to Show Cause filed by Plaintiff Donald B Williams. (sbou) |
|
10 | 10
order
Leave Issuance Appoint Special Master
Fri 05/20 4:14 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Plaintiff's Motions to Designate an Expert Witness, Issue an Order Directing the Clerk of the Court to Issue a Subpoena Deuces Tecum, Appoint a Special Master by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh7 8 9 . Plaintiff' s motions are denied. Plaintiff's motions all relate to discovery. However, the case has not proceeded to the point where Plaintiff is permitted to engage in discovery. In order to take discovery, Plaintiff's case must survive the Court's screening order, the Complaint must be served, and the Court must issue a discovery order. As none of those events has occurred, Plaintiff's motions are untimely and are therefore denied. SEE ORDER. (im) |
|
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appoint Special Master
Wed 05/18 3:11 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Appoint A Special Master filed by Plaintiff Donald B Williams. Motion set for hearing on 6/15/2016 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (im) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Issuance
Wed 05/18 3:09 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for an Order(s) Directed to the Clerk to Issue Subpoena Deuces Tecum(s) filed by Plaintiff Donald B Williams. Motion set for hearing on 6/15/2016 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (im) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Leave
Wed 05/18 3:07 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION Seeking Leave of the Court To Designate Expert Witness(es) filed by Plaintiff Donald B Williams. Motion set for hearing on 6/15/2016 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (im) |
|
6 | 6
attorney
Change of Address
Fri 05/13 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Change of address to 961 Kent Street, Altadena, CA 91001. Filed by Plaintiff Donald B. Williams. (im) |
|
Monday, May 02, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 05/03 8:42 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AT SCREENING STAGE by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. Though it appears to the Court that nothing Plaintiff can say or do can rectify the shortcomings in the Complaint, recognizing that Plaintiff is proceeding pro se, the Court will allow him an opportunity to explain why the Complaint should not be dismissed with prejudice at this stage. Plaintiff has until May 31, 2016, to file his brief. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 5/31/2016. (See document for further details.) (sbou) |
|
Monday, April 25, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV 60P)
Tue 04/26 11:09 AM
ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees is hereby GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915, the prisoner-plaintiff owes the Court thetotal filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $0 must be paid within thirty (30) days of the date this order is filed. Failure to remit the initial partial filing fee may result in dismissal of the case. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). re2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. (sbou) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Mon 04/25 4:48 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (esa) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV-60P)
Mon 04/25 4:48 PM
REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Donald B. Williams. (esa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Prisoner Civil Rights)
Mon 04/25 4:45 PM
CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendants Steven Cooley, Does, Tracy Kann, Dennis Kong, Steven Lubbell, The District Attorney of The County of Los Angeles, The Judicial Council of Los Angeles County, The Los Angeles County Public Defender, The Los Angeles County Superior Courts, The People of the State of California pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge Andrew J. Guilford and referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh, filed by Plaintiff Donald B. Williams. (esa) |