Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robin L Rosenberg
Referred: James M Hopkins
Case #: 9:16-cv-80655
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Oct 22, 2016 5:24 AM EDT
Defendant
ANTHONY BARBAR
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER BEETLE
Defendant
DANIEL CANE
Defendant
HEATHER COLTMAN
Defendant
MICHAEL DENNIS
Defendant
KATHRYN EDMUNDS
Defendant
JEFFREY FEINGOLD
Defendant
FLORIDA EDUCATION ASSOCIATION
Defendant
Florida Atlantic University Board of Trustees
Represented By
Keith E. Sonderling
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Sara Nicole Huff
Gunster
contact info
Gerard Joseph Curley, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Holly Lynn Griffin
Gunster, Yoakley , Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
JOHN W KELLY
Defendant
MARY MCDONALD
Defendant
MICHAEL MOATS
Defendant
ABDOL MOABERY
Defendant
GARY PERRY
Defendant
ROBERT ZOELLER, JR.
Defendant
ROBERT RUBIN
Defendant
ROBERT STILLEY
Defendant
PAUL TANNER
Defendant
JULIUS TESKE
Defendant
UNITED FACULTY OF FLORIDA
Defendant
THOMAS WORKMAN, JR.
Defendant
Diane Alperin
Represented By
Keith E. Sonderling
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Sara Nicole Huff
Gunster
contact info
Gerard Joseph Curley, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Holly Lynn Griffin
Gunster, Yoakley , Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Anthony Barbar
Represented By
Keith E. Sonderling
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Gerard Joseph Curley, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Holly Lynn Griffin
Gunster, Yoakley , Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Beetle
Represented By
Keith E. Sonderling
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Sara Nicole Huff
Gunster
contact info
Gerard Joseph Curley, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Holly Lynn Griffin
Gunster, Yoakley , Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Cane
Represented By
Keith E. Sonderling
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Gerard Joseph Curley, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Holly Lynn Griffin
Gunster, Yoakley , Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Heather Coltman
Represented By
Keith E. Sonderling
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Sara Nicole Huff
Gunster
contact info
Gerard Joseph Curley, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Holly Lynn Griffin
Gunster, Yoakley , Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Michael Dennis
Represented By
Keith E. Sonderling
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Gerard Joseph Curley, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Holly Lynn Griffin
Gunster, Yoakley , Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Kathryn Edmunds
Represented By
Keith E. Sonderling
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Gerard Joseph Curley, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Holly Lynn Griffin
Gunster, Yoakley , Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey Feingold
Represented By
Keith E. Sonderling
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Gerard Joseph Curley, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Holly Lynn Griffin
Gunster, Yoakley , Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Florida Education Association
Represented By
Robert F McKee
Robert F. Mckee, P.A.
contact info
Melissa Christine Mihok
Kelly & Mckee PA
contact info
Defendant
John W. Kelly
Represented By
Keith E. Sonderling
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Sara Nicole Huff
Gunster
contact info
Gerard Joseph Curley, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Holly Lynn Griffin
Gunster, Yoakley , Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Mary McDonald
Represented By
Keith E. Sonderling
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Gerard Joseph Curley, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Holly Lynn Griffin
Gunster, Yoakley , Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Abdol Moabery
Represented By
Keith E. Sonderling
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Gerard Joseph Curley, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Holly Lynn Griffin
Gunster, Yoakley , Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Michael Moats
Represented By
Robert F McKee
Robert F. Mckee, P.A.
contact info
Melissa Christine Mihok
Kelly & Mckee PA
contact info
Defendant
Gary Perry
Represented By
Keith E. Sonderling
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Sara Nicole Huff
Gunster
contact info
Gerard Joseph Curley, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Holly Lynn Griffin
Gunster, Yoakley , Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Robert Rubin
Represented By
Keith E. Sonderling
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Gerard Joseph Curley, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Holly Lynn Griffin
Gunster, Yoakley , Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Robert Stilley
Represented By
Keith E. Sonderling
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Gerard Joseph Curley, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Holly Lynn Griffin
Gunster, Yoakley , Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Paul Tanner
Represented By
Keith E. Sonderling
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Gerard Joseph Curley, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Holly Lynn Griffin
Gunster, Yoakley , Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Julius Teske
Represented By
Keith E. Sonderling
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Gerard Joseph Curley, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Holly Lynn Griffin
Gunster, Yoakley , Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
United Faculty of Florida
Represented By
Robert F McKee
Robert F. Mckee, P.A.
contact info
Melissa Christine Mihok
Kelly & Mckee PA
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Workman, Jr.
Represented By
Keith E. Sonderling
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Gerard Joseph Curley, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Holly Lynn Griffin
Gunster, Yoakley , Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Robert Zoeller, Jr.
Represented By
Robert F McKee
Robert F. Mckee, P.A.
contact info
Melissa Christine Mihok
Kelly & Mckee PA
contact info
Defendant
DIANE ALPERIN
Mediator
Steven A. Mayans
Plaintiff
James Tracy
Represented By
Joel D Medgebow
Medgebow Law, P.A.
contact info
Louis Frank Leo, IV
Medgebow Law, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 22, 2017
120 120 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert F McKee on behalf of Florida Education Association, Michael Moats, United Faculty of Florida, Robert Zoeller, Jr (McKee, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
119 119 motion Strike Tue 1:59 PM
MOTION to Strike107 Answer to Amended Complaint,106 Answer to Amended Complaint Defendants' Affirmative Defenses by James Tracy. Responses due by 4/4/2017(Leo, Louis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
118 118 order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Order Tue 10:50 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER setting pretrial deadlines as follows: The Parties shall exchange fact witness lists by June 7, 2017; The Parties shall exchange exhibit lists by June 23, 2017; The Parties shall provide expert witness disclosure and expert reports by June 30, 2017; The Parties shall provide rebuttal expert witnesses and rebuttal expert witness reports by July 15, 2017; All discovery must be completed July 17, 2017; and the deadline to amend pleadings is May 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/21/2017. (bkd)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2017
117 117 notice Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Mon 9:52 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re114 Stipulation. Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#116]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2017
116 116 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Mon 9:51 AM
JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Diane Alperin, Heather Coltman, Florida Atlantic University Board of Trustees, Florida Education Association, John W. Kelly, Michael Moats, James Tracy, United Faculty of Florida, Robert Zoeller, Jr. (ls)(See Image at DE #114)
Related: [-]
115 115 minutes Discovery Hearing Order on Motion to Compel Fri 4:51 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Order granting in part and denying in part108 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel in accordance with the terms stated on the record during the 3/17/2017 hearing on that Motion. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 40 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Holly Lynn Griffin, Louis Frank Leo, IV, Joel D Medgebow. (Digital 15:06:26) (ckr)
Related: [-]
114 114 misc Stipulation Fri 12:05 PM
STIPULATION re 112 Set/Reset Deadlines, Order,,,,,,,, Joint Scheduling Plan by James Tracy (Leo, Louis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2017
113 113 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 5:30 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re108 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and For Extension of Discovery Limits and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Diane Alperin, Heather Coltman, John W. Kelly. Replies due by 3/22/2017.(Griffin, Holly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A
112 112 order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Order Wed 9:55 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER resetting trial and pretrial deadlines. Trial in this case is reset to the two week trial period beginning on October 30, 2017, however, the parties are notified that, depending on criminal matters, this case may be called up towards the end of the two week trial period and may roll over into the following trial period which begins on November 13, 2017. Calendar Call is reset to October 25, 2017. The pretrial status conference is reset to September 27, 2017. Proposed jury instructions are due by October 23, 2017. Objections to designations of deposition testimony is due by October 16, 2017. Pretrial stipulation due by September 30, 2017. Mediation must be completed by August 30, 2017. All pretrial motions, including motions for summary judgment and motions in limine, must be filed by August 7, 2017. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint stipulation by March 17, 2017 wherein the parties provide the Court with proposed dates for all other pretrial deadlines, including the deadline for fact discovery. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/15/2017. (bkd)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 9:58 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: Calendar Call set for 10/25/2017 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Jury Trial set for 10/30/2017 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Status Conference set for 9/27/2017 09:30 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (bkd)
Related: [-]