Modest Needs Foundation et al v. Bianco et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Henry B Pitman |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-03144 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:2201dj Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Apr 27, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 24, 2016 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
Maria Bianco
625 Fulton Street Floor 5
Brooklyn, NY 11201 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joan M. Casali
1600 Stewart Avenue Suite 601
Westbury, NY 11590 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cesar Sabando
625 Fulton Street Floor 5
Brooklyn, NY 11201 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anthony S. Wetmore
150 Court Street Floor 5
New Haven, CT 06510 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kathleen Barker
625 Fulton Street Floor 5
Brooklyn, NY 11201 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Modest Needs Foundation
115 East 30th Street Floor 1
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith P. Taylor
45 W. 60th Street Apt. 24F
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
appeal
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
Mon 02/12 11:09 AM
Transmission of USCA Mandate to the District Judge re:41 USCA Mandate,. (nd) |
||
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 02/12 11:08 AM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to40 Notice of Appeal filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor. USCA Case Number 17-2605 Ordered that the appeal is DISMISSED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 02/09/2018. (nd) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
appeal
Appeal Fee Payment
Wed 08/23 12:11 PM
Appeal Fee Payment: for40 Notice of Appeal. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-14046938. (Miltenberg, Andrew) |
||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 08/21 3:37 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL from39 Clerk's Judgment,38 Memorandum & Opinion,. Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Miltenberg, Andrew) |
|
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Mon 08/21 3:47 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:40 Notice of Appeal. (tp) |
||
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
Mon 08/21 3:47 PM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for40 Notice of Appeal filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) |
||
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Fri 12/16 4:02 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:31 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . . Document filed by Kathleen Barker, Maria Bianco, Joan M. Casali, Cesar Sabando, Anthony S. Wetmore. (Wasserstrom, Leigh) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
28
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Fri 12/02 7:15 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:31 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . . Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor. (Miltenberg, Andrew) |
|
33 | 33
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Fri 12/02 6:10 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:31 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . . Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor. (Miltenberg, Andrew) |
|
Friday, October 28, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
25
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Fri 10/28 3:12 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:31 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . . Document filed by Kathleen Barker, Maria Bianco, Joan M. Casali, Cesar Sabando, Anthony S. Wetmore. (Wasserstrom, Leigh) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Dismiss
Fri 10/28 3:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . Document filed by Kathleen Barker, Maria Bianco, Joan M. Casali, Cesar Sabando, Anthony S. Wetmore.(Wasserstrom, Leigh) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 10/12 3:57 PM
ORDER granting29 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. THE SCHEDULE PROPOSED HEREIN IS APPROVED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 10/12/2016) (cla) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 10/12 3:57 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Kathleen Barker answer due 10/28/2016; Maria Bianco answer due 10/28/2016; Joan M. Casali answer due 10/28/2016; Cesar Sabando answer due 10/28/2016; Anthony S. Wetmore answer due 10/28/2016. Responses due by 12/2/2016 Replies due by 12/16/2016. (cla) |
||
Monday, October 10, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 10/10 9:12 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman from Leigh Wasserstrom dated October 10, 2016. Document filed by Kathleen Barker, Maria Bianco, Joan M. Casali, Cesar Sabando, Anthony S. Wetmore.(Wasserstrom, Leigh) |
|
Friday, September 02, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 09/02 3:15 PM
CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kathleen Barker, Maria Bianco, Joan M. Casali, Modest Needs Foundation, Cesar Sabando, Keith P. Taylor, Anthony S. Wetmore. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/2/2016) (kko) |
|
Thursday, September 01, 2016 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Tue 09/13 12:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 9/1/2016. (Daniels, Anthony) |
||
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Letter
Wed 08/31 5:36 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from PHILIP BYLER and LEIGH WASSERSTROM dated AUGUST 31, 2016 re: STATUS. Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor.(Byler, Philip) |
|
Tuesday, August 30, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/30 12:34 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leigh Aaron Wasserstrom on behalf of Kathleen Barker, Maria Bianco, Joan M. Casali, Cesar Sabando, Anthony S. Wetmore. (Wasserstrom, Leigh) |
|
Friday, August 12, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Fri 08/12 5:09 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FOR ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS served on UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE on August 12, 2016. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor. (Miltenberg, Andrew) |
|
24 | 24
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Fri 08/12 5:07 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FOR ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS served on ATTORNEY GENERAL on August 12, 2016. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor. (Miltenberg, Andrew) |
|
23 | 23
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Fri 08/12 4:57 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor. (Miltenberg, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, July 12, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 07/12 6:45 PM
ORDER granting21 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants' request for an adjournment of the initial pretrial conference in this case is granted. The conference scheduled for July 20, 2016 is adjourned to September 7, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. The joint letter and proposed case management plan described in this Court's May 18, 2016 order are due no later than August 31, 2016. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory) |
|
Monday, July 11, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Adjourn Conference Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 07/11 4:38 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from AUSA Tomoko Onozawa dated 7/11/2016., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from AUSA Tomoko Onozawa dated 7/11/2016. Document filed by Kathleen Barker, Maria Bianco, Joan M. Casali, Cesar Sabando, Anthony S. Wetmore.(Onozawa, Tomoko) |
|
Friday, May 20, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Fri 05/20 5:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Anthony S. Wetmore served on 5/11/2016, answer due 6/1/2016. Service was accepted by Tommie Major-Field Assistant Manager. Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation; Keith P. Taylor. (Miltenberg, Andrew) |
|
19 | 19
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Fri 05/20 5:48 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Joan M. Casali served on 5/11/2016, answer due 6/1/2016. Service was accepted by Chelcee Hew-Co-Worker. Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation; Keith P. Taylor. (Miltenberg, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, May 18, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Wed 05/18 10:37 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/20/2016 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/18/2016) (kko) |
|
Monday, May 02, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Issued
Mon 05/02 3:46 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony S. Wetmore. (dgo) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Issued
Mon 05/02 3:43 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maria Bianco. (dgo) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued
Mon 05/02 3:41 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cesar Sabando. (dgo) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Mon 05/02 3:36 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kathleen Barker. (dgo) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Mon 05/02 3:34 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joan M. Casali. (dgo) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/29 5:28 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anthony S. Wetmore, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor. (Miltenberg, Andrew) |
|
11 | 11
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/29 5:27 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maria Bianco, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor. (Miltenberg, Andrew) |
|
10 | 10
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/29 5:27 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cesar Sabando, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor. (Miltenberg, Andrew) |
|
9 | 9
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/29 5:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kathleen Barker, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor. (Miltenberg, Andrew) |
|
8 | 8
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/29 5:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joan M. Casali, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor. (Miltenberg, Andrew) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/29 4:42 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons, 3 Request for Issuance of Summons, 6 Request for Issuance of Summons, 2 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Plaintiff's attorney information missing on the Summons form;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/29 4:44 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (dgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/29 4:46 PM
Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. (dgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/29 4:46 PM
Case Designated ECF. (dgo) |
||
Thursday, April 28, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/28 1:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Miltenberg, Andrew) |
|
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/28 12:53 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joan M. Casali, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor. (Miltenberg, Andrew) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/28 12:52 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cesar Sabando, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor. (Miltenberg, Andrew) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/28 12:51 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anthony S. Wetmore, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor. (Miltenberg, Andrew) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/28 12:50 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kathleen Barker, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor. (Miltenberg, Andrew) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/28 12:49 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maria Bianco, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor. (Miltenberg, Andrew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/28 12:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Maria Bianco, Joan M. Casali, Cesar Sabando, Anthony S. Wetmore. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12239259)Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor.(Miltenberg, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Part 2 of 3, | ||
Att: 2 Part 3 of 3 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney to File Initial Pleading
Thu 04/28 11:09 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Andrew Todd Miltenberg to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 5/3/2016. (dgo) |
||
utility
Add Party for Pleading
Thu 04/28 12:32 PM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Maria Bianco, Joan M. Casali, Cesar Sabando, Anthony S. Wetmore, Kathleen Barker added. Party added pursuant to1 Complaint,. Document filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by Modest Needs Foundation, Keith P. Taylor.(Miltenberg, Andrew) |