LightSquared Inc.
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:12-bk-12080 |
Case Filed: | May 14, 2012 |
Claims Deadline: | Sep 25, 2012 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2016 |
Plan Confirmed: | Mar 27, 2015 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | More than $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | More than $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
LightSquared Inc.
450 Park Ave Ste 2201
New York, NY 10022-2672 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 24, 2013 3:12 PM EDT |
Claims and Noticing Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent
Attn: James Le 2335 Alaska Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago |
Monday, April 25, 2022 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 04/25 11:17 AM
Adversary Case 1:13-ap-1390 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |