Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William T Thurman
Case #: 2:16-bk-23671
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Jun 06, 2016
Claims Deadline:Sep 06, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Energy Drilling, LLC
600 E. 9600 N.
Cedar City, UT 84720
Represented By
Thomas H. Richards
Thomas Richards, P.C.
contact info
Warren R. Markowitz
The Markowitz Law Firm
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Ken Garff Bldg. 405 South Main Street Suite 300
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
Peter J. Kuhn tr
Us Trustees Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2016 6:00 PM MDT
Friday, April 29, 2016
1 1 4 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (FEE) Fri 2:38 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Energy Drilling, LLC (Richards, Thomas) (EOD: 04/29/2016)
Related: [-]