Able et al v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Sheri Polster Chappell |
Referred: | Mac R Mccoy |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00316 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | National Environmental Policy Act NEPA |
Case Filed: | Apr 28, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 06, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 25, 2016 5:21 AM EDT |
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Roversi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kurt Lenegmann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bertrum Marshall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Omar Mejia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hans Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Mohammed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Morrissey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Quasius
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Ross
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karl Kribbs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andres Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marco Scola
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vivienne Sinkow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Sloss
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randolph Wiggins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lana Zeigler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nina Able
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blake Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Beatty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Belicka
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bryan Billingsley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Buschle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jean Clark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margaret Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel DePart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Dean
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christian Espiert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Conor Forrest
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Gonicberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Greeves
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Irvine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ya Vuz Karagoz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Kribbs
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 07, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
utility
*Remark
Tue 06/07 2:16 PM
Remark: Case electronically transferred to Northern District of California MDL case number 2672. (laf) |
|
Monday, June 06, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Multidistrict litigation out
Tue 06/07 1:58 PM
MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California MDL case number: 2672 (SPB) |
|
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/13 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Finalized Conditional Transfer Order No. 39 Transferring the Subject Case to MultiDistrict Litigation Case No. 2672 by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.(Roth, Larry) Modified on 5/13/2016 to edit docket text (SLU) |
|
Att: 1 CTO-39 from MDL 2672 | ||
Wednesday, May 04, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on motion to stay
Wed 05/04 1:40 PM
ORDER granting 7 Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Stay All Proceedings. The Court stays all proceedings in this action until the MDL Court issues its Conditional Transfer Order and the ultimate jurisdictional location for this case is decided. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. shall file a status report every 90 days updating the Court of the status of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 5/4/2016. (JTM) |
|
9 | 9
utility
Possible MDL tag along case to Panel
Wed 05/04 8:35 AM
POSSIBLE MDL case for MDL Information emailed to MDL Panel on 5/4/16, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (SLU) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, | ||
Att: 2 Docket Sheet | ||
Monday, May 02, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Standing Order re: 25 pages
Mon 05/02 2:50 PM
STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/2/2016. (SPB) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Stay
Fri 04/29 3:15 PM
Unopposed MOTION to stay All Proceedings as to Any Further Pleadings, Including Plaintiffs filing of any Motion to Remand, and Scheduling Procedures Pending Conditional Transfer to MultiDistrict Proceedings In Re: Volkswagen "Clean Disel" Marketing Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation, MDL No. 2672, Supporting Memorandum of Law, and Certification of Counsel by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc..(Roth, Larry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Q, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit R, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit S, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit T, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit U, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit V, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit W | ||
6 | 6
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Fri 04/29 2:51 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/13/2016. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/29/2016. (BJH) |
|
5 | 5
order
Interested persons order
Fri 04/29 2:49 PM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/13/2016. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/29/2016. (BJH) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Fri 04/29 2:32 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Roth, Larry) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of appearance
Fri 04/29 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Martin Roth on behalf of Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Roth, Larry) |
|
Thursday, April 28, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/29 12:53 PM
COMPLAINT against Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. with Jury Demand originally filed in State Court on April 11,2016 filed by George Smith, Ya Vuz Karagoz, Vivienne Sinkow, Rachel DePart, Randolph Wiggins, Karen Beatty, Margaret Davis, David Ross, Conor Forrest, Paul Gonicberg, William Roversi, Marco Scola, Barbara Stewart, Andres Sanchez, Jason Mohammed, Douglas Irvine, Michael Kelly, Bryan Billingsley, Maria Quasius, Andrew Buschle, Christian Espiert, James Greeves, Gary Sloss, Ronald Kribbs, Nina Able, Laura Belicka, Michael Morrissey, Kurt Lenegmann, Jean Clark, Hans Miller, Lana Zeigler, Karl Kribbs, Omar Mejia, Paul Dean, Bertrum Marshall, Blake Anderson.(RMT) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/29 12:42 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in and for Lee County, Florida, case number 16-CA-001116 originally filed in State Court on April 11, 2016. Filing fee $400, receipt number FTM009297 filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.(RMT) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet |