Laser Energetics, Inc.
New Jersey Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Christine M Gravelle |
Case #: | 3:16-bk-18628 |
Case Filed: | May 02, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 06, 2016 |
Claims Deadline: | Nov 03, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 24, 2020 |
Debtor
Laser Energetics, Inc.
PO Box 7637
Princeton, NJ 08543-7637 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Andrea Dobin
Trenk DiPasquale 427 Riverview Plaza
Trenton, NJ 08611 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/28/2016 1:58 PM EDT |
Monday, May 02, 2016 | ||
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 16-18628 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31985677, fee amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
1 | 1 6 pgs Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Filed by Santo Bonanno on behalf of Laser Energetics, Inc.. Disclosure of Compensation for Attorney For Debtor05/16/2016. Incomplete Filings due by 05/16/2016. (Bonanno, Santo) | |
3 | 3 Notice of Missing Documents. . Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury For Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, Physical Street Address and Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G & H. Incomplete Filings due by 5/16/2016. (pbf) |