LHT Services, Inc. v. BP Exploration and Production, Inc. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Carl Barbier |
Referred: | Joseph C Wilkinson, Jr |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-04074 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | 33:2701 - Oil Pollution Act |
Case Filed: | May 02, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 22, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 29, 2016 4:06 AM CDT |
Defendant
BP America Production Company
Kirkland & Ellis, LLC 300 North LaSalle Street Suite 2400
Chicago, IL 60654 |
|
Defendant
BP Exploration and Production, Inc.
Kirkland & Ellis, LLP 300 North LaSalle Street Suite 2400
Chicago, IL 60654 |
|
Defendant
BP p.l.c.
Corporation Service Company 2711 Centreville Road
Wilmington, DE 19808 |
|
Defendant
BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
LHT Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, September 22, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Remark
Thu 09/22 12:51 PM
Remark **Notice of Dismissal filed as to LHT Services, Inc. - See Rec. Doc. #20200 filed in 10-2179 * (clc) |
|
Thursday, August 04, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 08/04 1:28 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) |
|
Monday, May 16, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 05/16 10:11 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to BP America Production Company on 5/2/2016, answer due 7/1/2016. (Mayhall, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 05/16 10:09 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to BP Exploration & Production, Inc. on 5/2/2016, answer due 7/1/2016. (Mayhall, Michael) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Fri 05/06 3:29 PM
ORDER Regarding New Lawsuits Filed Pursuant to Pretrial Order No. 60: ORDERED: 1. The Clerk of Court shall consolidate New Lawsuits with MDL 2179. 2. As stated in PTO 60, paragraph 9, New Lawsuits are STAYED until further order of the Court. Accordingly, until the stay is lifted or the Court instructs otherwise: The Clerk of Court need not sign, seal, and issue a summons; the time limit for serving a summons and complaint is suspended; a defendant need not answer or otherwise respond to a New Lawsuit; etc. 3. Upon consolidating a New Lawsuit with the MDL, the Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this Order and Pretrial Order 12 (concerning electronic service by LexisNexis File & Serve) into the docket for that New Lawsuit (i.e., not the master docket for MDL 2179). The Clerk of Court need not issue the other Pretrial Orders that previously issued upon consolidation. 4. All requirements of PTO 60 remain in effect, including the requirement that the sworn statement (Exhibit A to PTO 60) be served on counsel for BP and the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. (See PTO 60 paragraph 7, Rec. Doc. 16050). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/15/16. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 05/20/2013.(ADI) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Fri 05/06 3:29 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER #12. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/25/2010.(ADI) |
|
Wednesday, May 04, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 05/04 3:37 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (jeg) |
|
Monday, May 02, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 05/02 6:05 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5375120) filed by LHT Services, Inc..Attorney Michael A. Mayhall added to party LHT Services, Inc.(pty:pla).(Mayhall, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A |