Gateway Commercial Finance LLC v. NRG Building and Consulting, Inc.
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | James M Hopkins |
Case #: | 9:16-cv-80695 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | May 03, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 22, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 30, 2016 4:50 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
NRG Building and Consulting, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Gateway Commercial Finance LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NRG Building and Consulting, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Heidi M. Roth
Salmon & Dulberg 19 W. Flagler Street Suite 511
Miami, FL 33130 |
|
Plaintiff
Gateway Commercial Finance LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
3
pgs
order
Judgment - Consent
Tue 01/10 10:22 AM
CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT against NRG Building and Consulting, Inc. and Sandra J. Fisher. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/10/2017. (ls) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Judgment
Wed 01/04 3:41 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Judgment (Final) Against NRG Building and Consulting, Inc. and Sandra J. Fisher for Breach of the Settlement Agreement by Gateway Commercial Finance LLC.(Ullman, Jared) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order
Fri 12/23 3:25 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER upon the Notice at docket entry 23. To the extent the parties seek relief from this Court, the parties are directed to file a motion, not a notice. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/23/2016. (bkd) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 12/21 4:18 PM
NOTICE by Gateway Commercial Finance LLC of Filing Affidavit of Marc Marin in Support of Entry of Consent Final Judgment Against NRG Building and Consulting, Inc. and Sandra J. Fisher for Breach of the Settlement Agreement (Ullman, Jared) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Friday, July 22, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 07/22 9:52 AM
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND ORDER CLOSING CASE. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Plaintiff's Complaint and Defendant's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims are dismissed with prejudice. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT and all deadlines are terminated. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/22/2016. (mc) |
|
Tuesday, July 19, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
4
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 07/19 5:15 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by NRG Building and Consulting, Inc. (Rosenthal, Alex) |
|
Friday, July 01, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Order
Fri 07/01 1:09 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. Plaintiff shall have until and including July 20, 2016 to file and serve its response to NRG's Counterclaim filed on June 9, 2016. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/1/2016. (bkd) |
|
Thursday, June 30, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation
Thu 06/30 5:02 PM
STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COUNTERCLAIM by Gateway Commercial Finance LLC(Ullman, Jared) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 16, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Clerks Appointment of Mediator
Thu 06/16 11:08 AM
Clerk's Appointment of Mediator: Heidi M. Roth added (pt) |
|
Wednesday, June 15, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
adr
Request for Clerk to Appoint Mediator
Wed 06/15 5:08 PM
Request for Clerk to Appoint Mediator(Ullman, Jared) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Appoint Mediator
Wed 06/15 5:00 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Mediator by Gateway Commercial Finance LLC. Responses due by 7/5/2016 (Ullman, Jared) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
13
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Thu 06/09 10:25 AM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Gateway Commercial Finance LLC by NRG Building and Consulting, Inc..(Rosenthal, Alex) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, June 01, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation
Thu 06/02 8:19 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: (Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2016., Discovery due by 11/15/2016., Joinder of Parties due by 8/15/2016., In Limine Motions due by 12/15/2016., Motions due by 12/15/2016., Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/14/2017.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 3/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 6/1/2016. (mc) Modified on 6/2/2016 to correct pretrial stipulation deadline(mc) |
|
13 | 13
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Wed 06/01 4:04 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins: Scheduling Conference held on 6/1/2016. Scheduling Order will be issued separately. (Digital 15:41:33.) (ckr) |
|
Thursday, May 26, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Thu 05/26 1:44 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. NRG Building and Consulting, Inc. answer or responsive motion due 6/9/2016. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/26/2016. (bkd) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Thu 05/26 1:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by NRG Building and Consulting, Inc.. Attorney Alex Paul Rosenthal added to party NRG Building and Consulting, Inc.(pty:dft).(Rosenthal, Alex) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 23, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Mon 05/23 1:53 PM
STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE JAMES M. HOPKINS. Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 5/23/2016. (mc) |
|
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 05/23 11:21 AM
ENDORSED ORDER Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 6/1/2016 at 03:30 PM in the West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins. At least 48 hours before the conference, Plaintiff's counsel shall provide the Court (hopkins@flsd.uscourts.gov), and opposing counsel with a dial-in conference call number. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)'s conference report requirement. The parties must be prepared at their assigned time, but may have to wait 10-20 minutes before their conference begins, as the Court sets several cases per 30 minute time slot. Any motions to amend the trial date must be filed 2 days before the scheduling conference. Upon receipt of this Order, Plaintiff shall immediately forward the information contained herein to Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 5/23/2016. (ckr) |
|
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Judge
Mon 05/23 11:08 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE: (Status Conference set for 4/5/2017 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Jury Trial set for 5/15/2017 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 5/10/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/23/2016. (mc) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Mon 05/09 12:27 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re5 Summons Returned Executed. Incorrect Service Date Entered ; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see [de#6]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Mon 05/09 12:26 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Gateway Commercial Finance LLC. NRG Building and Consulting, Inc. served on 5/5/2016, answer due 5/26/2016. (ls)(See Image at DE #5 ) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Fri 05/06 4:19 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Gateway Commercial Finance LLC. NRG Building and Consulting, Inc. served on 5/4/2016, answer due 5/25/2016. (Ullman, Jared) |
|
Tuesday, May 03, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/03 4:29 PM
Summons Issued as to NRG Building and Consulting, Inc.. (srd) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Tue 05/03 4:25 PM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (srd) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Tue 05/03 4:25 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (srd) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 05/03 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT against NRG Building and Consulting, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-8705694, filed by Gateway Commercial Finance LLC.(Ullman, Jared) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Summon(s) |