Gilbert v. Hill et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia M Hernandez Covington |
Referred: | Julie S Sneed |
Case #: | 8:16-cv-01114 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 28:1338 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 05, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 02, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 01, 2016 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jaclyn Hill
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jaclyn Hill Cosmetics, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jaclyn Hill, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Peter J. Grilli
Peter J. Grilli, P.A. 3001 W. Azeele St.
Tampa, FL 33609 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mathew Chase Gilbert
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order dismissing case
Tue 11/01 3:55 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: This case is dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (Doc. # 38 ). The Clerk shall close the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/1/2016. (KAK) |
|
38 | 38
notice
Notice of voluntary dismissal
Tue 11/01 3:26 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Mathew Chase Gilbert (Cristal, Ben) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order on motion to dismiss
Thu 10/20 8:17 PM
ORDER: Hill's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 35 ) is GRANTED. Gilbert's Amended Complaint (Doc. # 23 ) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Gilbert is authorized to file a Second Amended Complaint, if he so chooses, on or before November 3, 2016. Failure to do so will result in closure of this case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/20/2016. (KAK) |
|
Wednesday, July 27, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
12
pgs
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 07/27 5:12 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Mathew Chase Gilbert. (Hanenian, Keith) |
|
Thursday, July 14, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
15
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Thu 07/14 9:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Brownstone, Justin) |
|
Thursday, July 07, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice to counsel of filing of official transcript
Thu 07/07 4:27 PM
NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Sharon A. Helbig. (SAH) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Transcript
Thu 07/07 4:25 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Case Management Hearing held on June 28, 2016 before Judge Victoria M. Hernandez Covington. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon A. Helbig,Telephone number 813-301-5041. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 7/28/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/5/2016. (SAH) |
|
Friday, July 01, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order appointing mediator
Fri 07/01 2:21 PM
ORDER appointing Peter Grilli, Esq. as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for April 5, 2017. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. See Local Rule 9.05(c). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/1/2016. (KAK) |
|
Thursday, June 30, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of appearance
Thu 06/30 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Paulette Brown Appearance by Keith M. Hanenian on behalf of Mathew Chase Gilbert (Hanenian, Keith) |
|
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of appearance
Wed 06/29 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter John Grilli on behalf of Peter J. Grilli (Grilli, Peter) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice of appearance
Wed 06/29 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Paulette Brown Appearance by Keith M. Hanenian on behalf of Mathew Chase Gilbert (Hanenian, Keith) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of mediation conference/hearing
Wed 06/29 10:20 AM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 4/5/2017 before Peter J. Grilli. (Hanenian, Keith) |
|
Tuesday, June 28, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
order
Case management and scheduling order
Tue 06/28 3:17 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2017 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for the November 2017 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Conduct mediation hearing by 4/5/2017. Keith M. Hanenian, Esq., to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/28/2016. (SAT) |
|
26 | 26
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 06/28 3:15 PM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington: CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/28/2016. Court Reporter: Sharon A. Helbig (SAT) |
|
Monday, June 27, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on motion to dismiss
Mon 06/27 1:59 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: On June 27, 2016, Plaintiff filed an Amended Complaint. (Doc. # 23 ). Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Doc. # 17 ) is accordingly denied without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/27/2016. (KAK) |
|
24 | 24
9
pgs
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 06/27 1:15 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Mathew Chase Gilbert. (Hanenian, Keith) |
|
23 | 23
25
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 06/27 1:12 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Mathew Chase Gilbert.(Hanenian, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 17 pgs Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Wed 06/22 4:00 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Mathew Chase Gilbert. (Hanenian, Keith) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Wed 06/22 10:07 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re6 Related case order and track 2 notice by Jaclyn Hill, Jaclyn Hill Cosmetics, LLC, Jaclyn Hill, LLC. (Ewusiak, Joel) |
|
Tuesday, June 21, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
8
pgs
misc
Case Management Report
Tue 06/21 5:34 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Ewusiak, Joel) |
|
Monday, June 20, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on motion to appear pro hac vice
Mon 06/20 5:51 PM
ORDER granting 15 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Justin Brownstone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 6/20/2016. (LBL) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order on motion to appear pro hac vice
Mon 06/20 5:48 PM
ORDER granting 13 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of David Michaels. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 6/20/2016. (LBL) |
|
Wednesday, June 15, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
12
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Wed 06/15 11:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by All Defendants. (Ewusiak, Joel) |
|
16 | 16
2
pgs
misc
Written designation and consent to act
Wed 06/15 5:22 PM
Written designation and consent to act by Joel J. Ewusiak on behalf of Jaclyn Hill, Jaclyn Hill Cosmetics, LLC, Jaclyn Hill, LLC. Local Counsel: Joel Ewusiak. Non-Resident Counsel: Justin Brownstone. (Ewusiak, Joel) |
|
15 | 15
2
pgs
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 06/15 5:21 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Justin Brownstone to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants.(Ewusiak, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration) | ||
14 | 14
misc
Written designation and consent to act
Wed 06/15 5:19 PM
Written designation and consent to act by Joel J. Ewusiak on behalf of Jaclyn Hill, Jaclyn Hill Cosmetics, LLC, Jaclyn Hill, LLC. Local Counsel: Joel Ewusiak. Non-Resident Counsel: David Michaels. (Ewusiak, Joel) |
|
13 | 13
2
pgs
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 06/15 5:18 PM
Unopposed MOTION for David Michaels to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants.(Ewusiak, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit 1 (Declaration) | ||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
Thu 06/16 10:59 AM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney David Michaels, appearing on behalf of Jaclyn Hill, Jaclyn Hill Cosmetics, LLC, Jaclyn Hill, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA037357.) Related document:13 Unopposed MOTION for David Michaels to appear pro hac vice. (AG) |
||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
Thu 06/16 11:00 AM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Justin Brownstone, appearing on behalf of Jaclyn Hill, Jaclyn Hill Cosmetics, LLC, Jaclyn Hill, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA037356.) Related document:15 Unopposed MOTION for Justin Brownstone to appear pro hac vice. (AG) |
||
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of hearing
Thu 06/09 10:12 AM
NOTICE of hearing: Case Management Hearing set for June 28, 2016, at 2:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Absent exigent circumstances and leave of Court, Lead Counsel must appear in person at the Case Management Hearing. Lead Counsel must be prepared to discuss the claims and defenses as well as any unique aspects of the case with the Court. This hearing is an investment of the Court's time and presents an opportunity for counsel to meet the judge presiding over their case as well as present any issues that should be called to the Court's attention. Prior to the Case Management Hearing, Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, to complete the Court's Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report Form is different from those used by other judges. Counsel shall bring this completed form to the Case Management Hearing. However, by June 21, 2016, Counsel shall file a Notice advising the Court of the parties' recommendations, agreed to or otherwise, concerning the deadlines normally included in the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order. At the Case Management Hearing, Counsel should also be prepared to inform the Court of their choice of a mediator and whether they will consent to disposition of the case by the assigned Magistrate Judge. (KAK) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on motion to extend time
Thu 06/09 9:28 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint (Doc. # 10 ) is granted. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the Complaint is extended to and including June 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/9/2016. (KAK) |
|
Wednesday, June 08, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
4
pgs
motion
Extend time
Wed 06/08 5:39 PM
Unopposed MOTION to extend time to file response to Complaint by Jaclyn Hill, Jaclyn Hill Cosmetics, LLC, Jaclyn Hill, LLC. (Ewusiak, Joel) |
|
Monday, June 06, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order to strike
Mon 06/06 3:39 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff initiated this action on May 5, 2016, and on June 1, 2016, the Court directed Plaintiff to file a status report regarding service of process by June 7, 2016. (Doc. # 7 ). On June 6, 2016, Plaintiff filed a document titled "Case Management" in which Plaintiff explains that "the Defendant accepted service, via mail, on May 11, 2016." (Doc. # 8 ). Thereafter, the document states that the Plaintiff granted "the Defendant" an extension of time to respond to the Complaint until June 15, 2016. The Court strikes the document from the record. In the instance that one of the Defendants seeks an extension of time in which to respond to the Complaint, the correct procedure is for that Defendant to confer with opposing counsel pursuant to Local Rule 3.01(g) and thereafter to file a Motion requesting the extension of time from the Court. As explained on the Court's website, "it is solely within the purview of the Court to grant an extension of time for the filing and service of a responsive pleading after the Complaint has been served. Agreements between the parties are ineffective without Court approval." Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/6/2016. (KAK) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Case Management Report
Mon 06/06 1:23 PM
STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOC. 9 ORDER. CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hanenian, Keith) Modified on 6/6/2016 (LD) |
|
Wednesday, June 01, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
*Order no pdf
Wed 06/01 2:38 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff shall provide a status by June 7, 2016, of this case. Specifically, plaintiff shall address its efforts to effect service of process. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/1/2016. (Covington, Virginia) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Fri 05/06 3:29 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/20/2016. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/6/2016. (DRW) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Copyright Report
Fri 05/06 3:27 PM
Copyright Report sent to Washington. (LD) |
|
Thursday, May 05, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons issued
Fri 05/06 3:15 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Jaclyn Hill Cosmetics, LLC. (LD) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Fri 05/06 3:12 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Jaclyn Hill, LLC. (LD) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
service
Summons issued
Fri 05/06 3:11 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Jaclyn Hill. (LD) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 05/06 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Jaclyn Hill, Jaclyn Hill Cosmetics, LLC, Jaclyn Hill, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number tpa36532) filed by Mathew Chase Gilbert.(LD) |
|
Att: 1 18 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet |