JANGJOO et al v. BROADCASTING BOARD OF GOVERNORS et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Trevor N Mcfadden |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00870 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 05, 2016 5:56 AM EDT |
Defendant
BROADCASTING BOARD OF GOVERNORS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Setareh Derakhshesh Sieg
Personally, as her personal capacity 4701 Willard AVE #415
Chevy Chase, MD 20815 |
|
Defendant
SETAREH DERAKHSHESH SIEG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Soheila Jangjoo
6159 Roxbury Ave
Springfield, VA 22152 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ardavan Roozbeh
11920 Shagbark Drive
Rockville, MD 20852 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SOHEILA JANGJOO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ARDAVAN ROOZBEH
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
51 | 51
order
.Order
Fri 12/14 11:34 AM
ORDER re Plaintiff's48 Notice of Breach of Protective Order. The Court finds that the Defendant's counsel did not breach the Court's28 Protective Order. It also finds that the Plaintiff's Notice was not filed in bad faith. Accordingly, the Defendant's request for attorney's fees is hereby DENIED. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/14/2018. (lctnm3) |