11
|
|
11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 06/23 8:34 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GTE Mobilnet of California Limited Partnership (Heard, James) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Fri 06/10 5:37 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2016 10:00 AM before Judge Cousins in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 7/27/2016. Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/24/2016. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/07 4:05 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal no longer assigned to the case. Signed by The Executive Committee on 06/06/2016. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 05/27 2:19 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GTE Mobilnet of California Limited Partnership.. (Heard, James) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Fri 05/13 4:05 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING AUGUST 9, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: In light of the pending resignation of Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal, all hearing dates presently set before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal are hereby vacated and should be re-noticed for hearing before the judge to whom this case is reassigned. Parties will be informed by separate notice of the judge to whom this case is reassigned. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Fri 05/13 9:41 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by GTE Mobilnet of California Limited Partnership identifying Corporate Parent Cellco Partnership, Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc, Corporate Parent Southwestco Wireless, L.P., Other Affiliate Southwestco Wireless, Inc. for GTE Mobilnet of California Limited Partnership. (Heard, James) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/10 1:28 PM
Summons Issued as to City Of Capitola. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 05/10 1:02 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2016. Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 05/10 10:09 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 5/24/2016. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 05/09 3:26 PM
Proposed Summons. (Heard, James) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 05/09 3:17 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment & Injunction against City Of Capitola ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10435929.). Filed byGTE Mobilnet of California Limited Partnership.(Heard, James) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|