Matthews et al v. Hilton International of Puerto Rico Inc et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | J Leon Holmes |
Case #: | 4:16-cv-00253 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 10, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 02, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 06, 2016 3:46 AM CST |
Defendant
Hilton International of Puerto Rico Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hilton Worldwide Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Natalie Matthews
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nick Matthews
|
Represented By
|
GPO
May 02 2017
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 35 Order entered separately today, this action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/2/2017. (mef) |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
order
Judgment
Tue 05/02 11:36 AM
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the35 Order entered separately today, this action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/2/2017. (mef) |
|
35 | 35
order
Order
Tue 05/02 11:33 AM
ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/2/2017. (mef) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 05/01 2:59 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re26 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Otilio Ramos and all motions relying on his statements filed by Hilton International of Puerto Rico Inc, Hilton Worldwide Inc. (Lowther, Edwin) |
|
33 | 33
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Mon 05/01 2:58 PM
RESPONSE in Support re17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Personal Jurisdiction and Venue) filed by Hilton International of Puerto Rico Inc, Hilton Worldwide Inc. (Lowther, Edwin) |
|
32 | 32
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Mon 05/01 2:57 PM
RESPONSE in Support re21 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Piercing the Corporate Veil) filed by Hilton International of Puerto Rico Inc, Hilton Worldwide Inc. (Lowther, Edwin) |
|
31 | 31
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Mon 05/01 2:56 PM
RESPONSE in Support re19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Statute of Limitations) filed by Hilton International of Puerto Rico Inc, Hilton Worldwide Inc. (Lowther, Edwin) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
brief
Brief in Support
Mon 04/24 9:39 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re29 Response to Motion to dismiss regarding failure to pierce the corporate veil filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lauck, Chester) |
|
29 | 29
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 04/24 9:37 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re21 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Piercing the Corporate Veil) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Lauck, Chester) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Natalie Matthews | ||
28 | 28
brief
Brief in Support
Mon 04/24 9:35 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re27 Response to Motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdictiona and venue filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lauck, Chester) |
|
27 | 27
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 04/24 9:33 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Personal Jurisdiction and Venue) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Lauck, Chester) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Natalie Matthews | ||
26 | 26
motion
Strike
Mon 04/24 9:30 PM
MOTION to Strike Declaration of Otilio Ramos and all motions relying on his statements by All Plaintiffs (Lauck, Chester) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Objections
Mon 04/24 9:28 PM
OBJECTIONS by Natalie Matthews, Nick Matthews (Lauck, Chester) |
|
24 | 24
brief
Brief in Support
Mon 04/24 9:23 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re23 Response to Motion to dismiss regarding the statute of limitations filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lauck, Chester) |
|
23 | 23
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 04/24 9:21 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Statute of Limitations) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Lauck, Chester) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Natalie Matthews | ||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
brief
Brief in Support
Mon 04/10 2:22 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re21 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Piercing the Corporate Veil) filed by Hilton Worldwide Inc. (Lowther, Edwin) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Mon 04/10 2:21 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Piercing the Corporate Veil) by Hilton Worldwide Inc (Lowther, Edwin) |
|
20 | 20
brief
Brief in Support
Mon 04/10 2:17 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re19 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Statute of Limitations) filed by Hilton International of Puerto Rico Inc, Hilton Worldwide Inc. (Lowther, Edwin) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Mon 04/10 2:17 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Statute of Limitations) by Hilton International of Puerto Rico Inc, Hilton Worldwide Inc (Lowther, Edwin) |
|
18 | 18
brief
Brief in Support
Mon 04/10 2:14 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re17 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Personal Jurisdiction and Venue) filed by Hilton International of Puerto Rico Inc, Hilton Worldwide Inc. (Lowther, Edwin) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Mon 04/10 2:13 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Personal Jurisdiction and Venue) by Hilton International of Puerto Rico Inc, Hilton Worldwide Inc(Lowther, Edwin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Otilio Ramos | ||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 03/15 8:06 AM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the week of 12/4/2017 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Judge J. Leon Holmes. Discovery due by 9/21/2017. Motions due by 10/5/2017. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 11/14/2017. Status Report due by 10/5/2017. Signed at the direction of the Court. (cdw) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Tue 01/10 3:16 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Hilton International of Puerto Rico Inc, Hilton Worldwide Inc. (Lowther, Edwin) |
|
Tuesday, November 08, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Tue 11/08 9:37 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/28/2016. Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/11/2017. Proposed jury trial date the week of 12/4/2017 in Little Rock before Judge J. Leon Holmes. Signed at the direction of the Court. (cdw) |
|
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 10/11 2:27 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint supplemental affidavit supporting service due to the improper and incorrect listing of Jose Campos as the registered agent , filed by Natalie Matthews, Nick Matthews. (Lauck, Chester) |
|
Monday, September 19, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Mon 09/19 11:37 AM
ORDER granting in part the plaintiff's7 motion for extension of time to serve defendant Hotel Caribe Hilton. The time within which the plaintiffs must serve summons and complaint on Hotel Caribe Hilton is extended up to and including 10/19/2016. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/19/2016. (ljb) |
|
Thursday, September 15, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
brief
Brief in Support
Thu 09/15 4:35 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re10 Response to Motion filed by All Defendants. (Lowther, Edwin) |
|
10 | 10
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 09/15 4:34 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re7 First MOTION to Extend Time for service of process pursuant to FRCP 4(m) filed by All Defendants. (Lowther, Edwin) |
|
Wednesday, September 14, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 09/14 1:28 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Hilton International of Puerto Rico Inc, Hilton Worldwide Inc.(Rather, Gordon) |
|
Friday, September 09, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 09/09 1:42 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint in addition to previous service , filed by Natalie Matthews, Nick Matthews.(Lauck, Chester) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Security entrance for registered agent address, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Registered Agent Address Security Entrance, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Managing Agent accepting summons and complaint on behalf of defendant and Jose Campos, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Business Card of managing agent accepting service on behalf of defendant and Jose Campos | ||
Friday, September 02, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extend Time
Fri 09/02 5:47 PM
First MOTION to Extend Time for service of process pursuant to FRCP 4(m) by All Plaintiffs (Lauck, Chester) |
|
Monday, August 15, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 08/15 10:20 AM
ORDER granting the defendants'5 motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiffs'1 complaint. The deadline for defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended up to and including 9/16/2016. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/15/2016. (ljb) |
|
Friday, August 12, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 08/12 12:58 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by All Defendants (Lowther, Edwin) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/12 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin Lee Lowther, III on behalf of All Defendants (Lowther, Edwin) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 07/29 2:02 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc. , filed by Natalie Matthews, Nick Matthews. Hilton International of Puerto Rico Inc served on 7/29/2016.(Lauck, Chester) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit return of service, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit summons Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc. | ||
2 | 2
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 07/29 1:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Hilton Worldwide, Inc. , filed by Natalie Matthews, Nick Matthews. Hilton Worldwide Inc served on 7/26/2016.(Lauck, Chester) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit return of service, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit summoms | ||
Friday, July 22, 2016 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/22 11:16 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (alm) |
||
Tuesday, May 10, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/11 11:08 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Natalie Matthews and Nick Matthews against Hilton International of Puerto Rico Inc and Hilton Worldwide Inc. No summons issued. (Fee of $400 Paid - Receipt Number LIT056635.) (rhm) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |