VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R v. martinez et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Darrin P Gayles |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-21677 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1345 Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | May 11, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 31, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 07, 2016 3:29 AM EST |
Defendant
Rafeal E Martinez
|
|
Defendant
Mortgage Electronic Recordation Systems, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Shores Villas Condominium Association, Inc.
12895 SW 132 Street 103
Miami, FL 33186 |
|
Defendant
Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc.
1818 Library Street Suite 300
Reston, VA 20190 |
|
Plaintiff
VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R
7500 OLD GEORGETOWN ROAD SUITE
BETHESDA, MD 20814 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 08/31 4:37 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Closing Case. Motions terminated:17 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment of Foreclosure filed by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R,25 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time TO COMPLY WITH AUGUST 25TH, 2016 COURT ORDER filed by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R,24 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER filed by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/31/2016. (ahk) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/31 1:08 PM
NOTICE by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R OF FILING (Echavarria, David) |
|
Att: 1 Motion for Summary Final Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Indebtedness, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit of Attorney's Fees and Costs, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Final Judgment, | ||
Att: 5 Copy of Notice of Filing Original Note & Mortgage | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/31 12:55 PM
NOTICE by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R OF FILING (Echavarria, David) |
|
Att: 1 Note, | ||
Att: 2 Mortgage | ||
27 | 27
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Wed 08/31 12:02 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R.(Echavarria, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
26 | 26
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 08/31 12:00 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re25 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time TO COMPLY WITH AUGUST 25TH, 2016 COURT ORDER filed by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R. Replies due by 9/12/2016.(Echavarria, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Tuesday, August 30, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 08/30 3:09 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time TO COMPLY WITH AUGUST 25TH, 2016 COURT ORDER by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R. Responses due by 9/16/2016 (Echavarria, David) |
|
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 08/29 4:05 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R. Responses due by 9/15/2016 (Echavarria, David) |
|
Thursday, August 25, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Striking
Thu 08/25 5:19 PM
NOTICE of Striking Order for Mediation by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R (Echavarria, David) |
|
22 | 22
adr
Notice of Mediation Hearing
Thu 08/25 4:54 PM
Notice of Mediation Hearing before Mediator, Naomi Potash filed by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R. Mediation Hearing set for 10/11/2016 04:00 PM (Echavarria, David) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 08/25 12:09 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On or before August 31, 2016, at 12:00 noon , Plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/25/2016. (ahk) |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Thu 08/25 2:29 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re19 Notice of Mediation Hearing. Proposed Order Docketed as Main Document ; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then resubmit the proposed order as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures (lh) |
|
19 | 19
adr
Notice of Mediation Hearing
Wed 08/24 5:06 PM
Notice of Mediation Hearing before Mediator, Naomi Potash filed by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R. Mediation Hearing set for 10/11/2016 04:00 PM (Echavarria, David) |
|
Tuesday, August 23, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 08/23 11:34 AM
NOTICE by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R of Filing (Echavarria, David) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Attorney's Fees and Costs | ||
17 | 17
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 08/23 11:24 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment of Foreclosure by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R. Responses due by 9/9/2016 (Echavarria, David) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 08/22 3:12 PM
ENDORSED ORDER on Default Procedure. On or before August 29, 2016, Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment, accompanied by a proposed final default judgment attached to the motion as Exhibit A, and duly supported by affidavits and other documentation. Plaintiff's failure to file a motion for default judgment on or before the date set forth above may result in dismissal of the instant action without further notice. The Plaintiff is further directed to immediately provide the Defendants with a copy of this Order via certified mail. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/22/2016. (ahk) |
|
Friday, August 19, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Lis Pendens
Fri 08/19 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R for property located at Miami-Dade County (Echavarria, David) |
|
Thursday, July 28, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Clerks Entry of Default - FORM
Thu 07/28 11:15 AM
ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re12 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to Rafeal E Martinez, Shores Villas Condominium Association, Inc., and Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc.. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 7/28/2016. (lh) |
|
Wednesday, July 27, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Affidavit
Wed 07/27 12:41 PM
AFFIDAVIT signed by : David Echavarria. by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R(Echavarria, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
12 | 12
motion
Clerks Entry of Default
Wed 07/27 12:38 PM
First MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to All Defendants by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R.(Echavarria, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Fri 05/13 4:46 PM
Summons Issued as to Rafeal E Martinez, Mortgage Electronic Recordation Systems, Inc., Shores Villas Condominium Association, Inc.. (lh) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Fri 05/13 4:43 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re7 Intervenor Complaint. Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#9]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (lh) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/13 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Filing by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R re 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) (lh) |
|
8 | 8
order
Notice of Court Practice
Fri 05/13 4:01 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 5/13/2016. (ahk) |
|
7 | 7
cmp
Intervenor Complaint
Fri 05/13 11:28 AM
Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R.(Echavarria, David) |
|
Att: 1 Summon(s) Civil Summons - Corporation, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) Civil Summons - Individual | ||
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Clerks Notice to Filer - ELECTRONIC CASE, SUMMONS(ES)
Fri 05/13 8:51 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Due to the number of days of service. (srd) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 05/12 2:36 PM
NOTICE by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R (Echavarria, David) |
|
Wednesday, May 11, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Thu 05/12 10:51 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (srd) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Thu 05/12 10:49 AM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (srd) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Thu 05/12 10:49 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles (srd) |
|
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-8729542, filed by VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R.(Echavarria, David) | |
Att: 1 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit |