Malcolm et al v. Maxwell & Morgan PC
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | G Murray Snow |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-01473 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | May 12, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 07, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 08, 2016 2:02 AM MST |
Defendant
Maxwell & Morgan PC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edris Malcolm
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Rosario Torres
Terminated: 06/24/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Wednesday, December 14, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Wed 12/14 2:04 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT by Edris Malcolm. (Thompson, Russell) |
|
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Clerks Judgment
Thu 11/03 1:38 PM
AMENDED CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed November 3, 2016, judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff and against defendant in the amount of $ 6,024.00. (EJA) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Thu 11/03 1:37 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is awarded $4,623.00 in fees and $400.00 in costs for a total of $5,023.00. The Clerk of Court is directed to update the judgment entered in this case to reflect the total amount of $6,024.00, which is inclusive of damages pursuant to the offer of judgment, reasonable attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/3/16.(EJA) |
|
Thursday, October 27, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 10/27 5:12 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:13 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Edris Malcolm.(Panvini, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit E - Hicks Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit F - Supplemental Statement of Services, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit G - Declaration of Joseph Panvini, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 10/20 10:05 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re:13 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Maxwell & Morgan PC.(Morgan, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Counsel In Support of Defendant's Opposition | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Thu 10/20 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian W Morgan on behalf of Maxwell & Morgan PC. (Morgan, Brian) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Costs Taxed
Tue 10/18 7:04 AM
Taxation Judgment in amount of $400.00 against defendant. Signed by Chief Deputy Clerk Michael O'Brien on 10/18/2016. (CSL) |
|
Wednesday, September 21, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Bill of Costs
Wed 09/21 5:43 PM
BILL OF COSTS by Edris Malcolm. (Panvini, Joseph) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Attorney Fees
Wed 09/21 5:42 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees by Edris Malcolm.(Panvini, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Statement of Consultation, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Statement of Services, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Declaration of Russell S. Thompson, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Consumer Law Fee Survey | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Wed 09/21 5:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Michael Panvini on behalf of Edris Malcolm. (Panvini, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, September 07, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Clerks Judgment
Wed 09/07 9:53 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED Pursuant to Rule 68(a), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Edris Malcolm has accepted the offer of judgment of Defendant Maxwell & Morgan PC's in the amount of One Thousand and One dollars ($1,001.00). (KMG) |
|
Friday, September 02, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
Fri 09/02 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Rosario Torres .(Thompson, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Offer of Judgment | ||
Tuesday, July 19, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service Executed
Tue 07/19 12:11 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Edris Malcolm: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 07/07/2016 to Mark W. Waldron . (Thompson, Russell) |
|
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 06/24 5:27 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Maxwell & Morgan PC filed by Edris Malcolm.(Thompson, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - May 29, 2015 Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - November 2, 2015 Letter | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))
Fri 06/24 5:24 PM
NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Edris Malcolm .(Thompson, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Redlined First Amended Class Complaint | ||
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 05/13 4:29 PM
ORDER/NOTICE that pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, you must serve each Defendant in your case with the Summons and Complaint within 90 days from the date the Complaint is filed. IT IS ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 8/12/2016. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/13/2016. (KFZ) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order
Fri 05/13 4:23 PM
ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of a motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file notice of service. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/13/2016. (KFZ) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 05/13 2:07 PM
Summons Issued as to Maxwell & Morgan PC. (KMG) |
|
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Fri 05/13 1:52 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-12961989. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 16-01473 PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KMG) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Fri 05/13 1:50 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Edris Malcolm, Rosario Torres. (submitted by Russell Thompson) (KMG) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 05/13 1:48 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12961989 filed by Edris Malcolm, Rosario Torres. (submitted by Russell Thompson)(KMG) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |