Bonamar, Corp. v. Turkin et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ursula Ungaro |
Referred: | Alicia M Otazo-Reyes |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-21746 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question |
Case Filed: | May 16, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 03, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 12, 2016 5:10 AM EST |
Counter Claimant
Troy Turkin
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Bonamar, Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Supreme Crab & Seafood, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Troy Turkin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bonamar, Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 22, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 08/22 1:25 PM
ORDER this cause came before the Court upon Stipulation of Dismissal DE36 . All claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/22/2016. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
order
Notice of Court Practice
Wed 08/03 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES. The parties are hereby notified that all papers related to the settlement reached between the parties must be filed by August 19, 2016. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/3/2016. (mc) |
|
37 | 37
order
Administrative Order
Wed 08/03 3:27 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. This case is CLOSED for administrative purposes. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/3/2016. (mc) |
|
36 | 36
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/03 2:43 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bonamar, Corp. (DeSouza, Daniel) |
|
35 | 35
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Wed 08/03 10:25 AM
AGREED ORDER ON BONAMAR, CORP.S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 8/3/2016. (ear) |
|
Tuesday, August 02, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/02 8:42 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2017 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Jury Trial set for 4/3/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 3/29/2017 01:00 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Amended Pleadings due by 8/26/2016. Discovery due by 12/16/2016. Joinder of Parties due by 8/26/2016. In Limine Motions due by 1/27/2017. Motions due by 1/20/2017. Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/3/2017. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/29/2016. (mc) [LINK:Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.] |
|
Monday, August 01, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order Referring Case to Mediation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 08/02 8:24 AM
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. (Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2017 10:30 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/29/2016. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, July 27, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 07/27 11:16 AM
ORDER granting31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew Paul Gold and Scott William Rostock terminated. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/25/2016. (cqs) (Main Document 32 replaced on 7/27/2016 image upside down) (cqs). Modified on 7/27/2016 (cqs). |
|
Monday, July 25, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 07/25 11:48 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Akerman LLP's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant, Supreme Crab & Seafood, Inc. by Andrew P. Gold and Scott W. Rostock. by Supreme Crab & Seafood, Inc.. Responses due by 8/11/2016(Gold, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 15, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1
Fri 07/15 2:50 PM
SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Supreme Crab & Seafood, Inc.(Gold, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 14, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/14 2:34 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Supreme Crab & Seafood, Inc. (Gold, Andrew) |
|
Monday, July 11, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 07/11 4:26 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Supreme Crab & Seafood, Inc.. Replies due by 7/21/2016.(Eleff, Stanley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
27 | 27
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 07/11 1:45 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Defendant Troy Turkin's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Troy Turkin. Replies due by 7/21/2016.(Visconti, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Troy Turkin, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Employment Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Modification Agreement, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D- Non-Compete Agreement, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E- Addendum to Non-Compete | ||
Wednesday, July 06, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Wed 07/06 6:16 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting25 Unopposed MOTION to Continue. The Evidentiary Hearing set for 7/25/2016 at 10:00 AM is hereby RESET to 8/10/2016 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 7/6/2016. (ear) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Continue
Wed 07/06 2:35 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction re 19 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, Set/Reset Hearings,, by Bonamar, Corp.. Responses due by 7/25/2016(DeSouza, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Deposition | ||
24 | 24
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Wed 07/06 2:33 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim by Bonamar, Corp.. (DeSouza, Daniel) |
|
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 07/06 12:50 PM
ORDER granting21 Agreed MOTION Agreed Motion for Early, Expedited Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 7/6/2016. (ear) |
|
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 07/08 9:57 AM
Set/Reset Hearings Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/10/2016 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Per DE 26 (cbr) |
||
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order Referring Motion
Wed 07/06 9:55 AM
ORDER REFERRING21 Agreed MOTION Agreed Motion for Early, Expedited Discovery filed by Troy Turkin Motions referred to Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/5/2016. (lrz) |
|
Friday, July 01, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 07/01 4:23 PM
Agreed MOTION Agreed Motion for Early, Expedited Discovery by Troy Turkin. Attorney Melissa Damian Visconti added to party Troy Turkin(pty:dft).(Visconti, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 06/29 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott William Rostock on behalf of Supreme Crab & Seafood, Inc.. Attorney Scott William Rostock added to party Supreme Crab & Seafood, Inc.(pty:dft). (Rostock, Scott) |
|
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order Setting Hearing on Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 06/24 5:26 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Evidentiary Hearing on11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for 7/25/2016 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/24/2016. (ear) |
|
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Motion
Fri 06/24 10:49 AM
ORDER REFERRING11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bonamar, Corp. to Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes to take all necessary and proper action as required by law. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/24/2016. (pes) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 06/24 10:46 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond Re:11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bonamar, Corp.. Responses due by 7/11/2016. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/24/2016. (pes) |
|
Thursday, June 23, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 06/23 4:46 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plantiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction re11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Troy Turkin. Responses due by 7/11/2016(Damian, Melanie) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 21, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 06/21 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anne Connelly Leonard on behalf of Supreme Crab & Seafood, Inc.. Attorney Anne Connelly Leonard added to party Supreme Crab & Seafood, Inc.(pty:dft). (Leonard, Anne) |
|
Thursday, June 16, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
9
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/16 4:31 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Supreme Crab & Seafood, Inc.. Attorney Stanley Howard Eleff added to party Supreme Crab & Seafood, Inc.(pty:dft). (Eleff, Stanley) |
|
13 | 13
15
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Thu 06/16 3:38 PM
Defendant Troy Turkin's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint and , COUNTERCLAIM to Plaintiff's Complaint against Bonamar, Corp. by Troy Turkin.(Damian, Melanie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Employment Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Modification Agreement | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 06/16 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melanie Emmons Damian on behalf of Troy Turkin. Attorney Melanie Emmons Damian added to party Troy Turkin(pty:dft). (Damian, Melanie) |
|
Tuesday, June 14, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
16
pgs
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Tue 06/14 3:42 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Bonamar, Corp..(DeSouza, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Argenis Contreras, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Employment Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Michael Michael Ciarmitaro, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Troy Turkin LinkedIn Page, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Alan Mohl | ||
Wednesday, June 01, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Wed 06/01 8:56 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re7 Order to Show Cause by Bonamar, Corp.. (DeSouza, Daniel) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 06/01 8:55 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Bonamar, Corp.. Troy Turkin served on 5/31/2016, answer due 6/21/2016. (DeSouza, Daniel) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 06/01 8:54 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Bonamar, Corp.. Supreme Crab & Seafood, Inc. served on 5/26/2016, answer due 6/16/2016. (DeSouza, Daniel) |
|
Friday, May 27, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 05/31 8:53 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 6/2/2016. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/27/2016. (cbr) |
|
Sunday, May 22, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Sun 05/22 7:39 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bonamar, Corp. (DeSouza, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 05/19 2:34 PM
ORDER Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference, ( -Joint Scheduling Report due by 7/15/2016, Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2016 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/19/16. (cbr) |
|
Tuesday, May 17, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/17 8:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Supreme Crab & Seafood, Inc., Troy Turkin. (jc) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Tue 05/17 8:43 AM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (jc) |
|
Monday, May 16, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Tue 05/17 8:43 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro (jc) |
|
1 | 1 15 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-8742071, filed by Bonamar, Corp..(DeSouza, Daniel) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) Summons to Turkin, | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s) Summons to Supreme Crab |